CHIM v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Plaintiff: RENEE CHIM
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Case Number: 1:2019cv03007
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 1/21/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 1/21/2020. Joint Status Report due by 4/10/2020. Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) due by 5/22/2020. Defendant Rule 26(a)(2) due by 6/22/2020. Rebuttal Reports and Disclosures due by 7/6/2020. Discovery shall conclude on 8/22/2020. Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 9/2/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter: the parties shall exchange initial disclosures by December 20, 2019; the deadline for joinder of parties and amendments of pleadings is January 21, 2020; the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report regarding the status of discovery by April 10, 2020; plaintiff shall make initial expert disclosures by May 22, 2020; defendant shall make initial expert disclosures by June 22, 2020; rebuttal expert reports and disclosures are due by July 6, 2020; discovery shall conclude on August 22, 2020; and a Post-Discovery Status Conference is set for September 2, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/22/2019. (lcapm1)
November 22, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 11/22/2019. Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 9/2/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff Counsel's #7 Consent Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone. Counsel C. Perrin Rome, III, may attend the Initial Scheduling Conference on November 22, 2019 by phone. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/15/2019. (lcapm1)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Weisbaum, Steven)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone by RENEE CHIM (Weisbaum, Steven)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney C. Perrin Rome, III is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/21/2019. (lcapm1)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- C. Perrin Rome, III, :Firm- Rome, Arata, Baxley & Stelly, LLC, :Address- 650 Poydras Street, Poydras Center, Suite 2017, New Orleans, LA 70130. Phone No. - 504-522-9980. Fax No. - 504-522-9971 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6466355. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by RENEE CHIM (Weisbaum, Steven)
October 17, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/22/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER setting an Initial Scheduling Conference for November 22, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/17/2019. (lcapm1)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to Counsel/Party (zmc)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Mark Weisbaum on behalf of RENEE CHIM (Weisbaum, Steven)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (McGrath, Felicity)
October 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zrdj)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2019 CA 005146 B (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(McGrath, Felicity)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHIM v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RENEE CHIM
Represented By: Steven Mark Weisbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Represented By: Felicity Ann McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?