STEPHENS COUNTY HOSPITAL v. AZAR
Plaintiff: STEPHENS COUNTY HOSPITAL
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv03022
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/28/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/27/2019. (Glazer, Joseph)
November 21, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/28/2019. (Glazer, Joseph)
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 10/24/2019 (Glazer, Joseph)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 10/17/2019 (Glazer, Joseph)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/18/2019. (Glazer, Joseph)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/18/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/17/2019. (Glazer, Joseph)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II filed by STEPHENS COUNTY HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PRRB Decision, #2 Exhibit Secretary Decision)(Glazer, Joseph)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Walker, Johnny)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
October 11, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zmc)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by STEPHENS COUNTY HOSPITAL. Case related to Case No. 19-cv-3020. (Glazer, Joseph)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by STEPHENS COUNTY HOSPITAL (Glazer, Joseph)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6436519) filed by STEPHENS COUNTY HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PRRB Decision, #2 Exhibit Secretary Decision, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Attorney General, #5 Summons Azar, #6 Summons US Attorney)(Glazer, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STEPHENS COUNTY HOSPITAL v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHENS COUNTY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?