EMRIT v. NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE et al
Plaintiff: RONALD SATISH EMRIT
Defendant: WASHINGTON REDSKINS, DANIEL SNYDER and NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE
Case Number: 1:2019cv03086
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/14/2019. (zmd)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/14/2019. (zmd)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by RONALD SATISH EMRIT.(zrdj)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RONALD SATISH EMRIT (zeg).
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, DANIEL SNYDER, WASHINGTON REDSKINS with Jury Demand filed by RONALD SATISH EMRIT. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zeg).
October 10, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 10/10/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zeg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EMRIT v. NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASHINGTON REDSKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL SNYDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD SATISH EMRIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?