SANCHEZ SANCHEZ v. ULTIMO, LLC D/B/A MALBEC RESTAURANT et al
Plaintiff: ADAN SANCHEZ SANCHEZ
Defendant: FELIX NELSON AYALA, SR., ULTIMO, LLC D/B/A MALBEC RESTAURANT, ULTIMO, LLC and ULTIMO, LLC doing business as MALBEC RESTAURANT
Case Number: 1:2019cv03188
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Robin M Meriweather
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather for all purposes, including trial, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 73.1. Judge Timothy J. Kelly is no longer assigned to the case. (zad)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: As reflected in their #7 Joint Local Civil Rule 16.3(c) Report, the parties have consented to the assignment of this case to a magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 73.1. Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that this matter is referred to a magistrate judge, beginning immediately; the magistrate judge will be randomly assigned by the Clerk's Office. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/18/19. (lctjk2)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Amster, Michael)
December 11, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zkh)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Defendants' consent motion for continuance. It is hereby ORDERED that the Initial Scheduling Conference currently scheduled for January 7, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. is CONTINUED to January 14, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. If the parties are unavailable at that time, they shall jointly contact the Courtroom Deputy at (202) 354-3495 to determine a mutually agreeable date and time for the parties and the Court.Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/11/19. (lctjk2)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION to Continue Notice of Hearing by ULTIMO, LLC (Veve, Michael)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: An Initial Scheduling Conference is set for January 7, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11. The parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint report pursuant to FRCP 26(f) and Local Rule 16.3. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/29/19. (lctjk2)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by ULTIMO, LLC.(Veve, Michael)
November 11, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FELIX NELSON AYALA, SR served on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019 (Amster, Michael)
November 11, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ULTIMO, LLC D/B/A MALBEC RESTAURANT served on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019 (Amster, Michael)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to FELIX NELSON AYALA, SR, ULTIMO, LLC D/B/A MALBEC RESTAURANT. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
October 28, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (adh, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6476864) filed by ADAN SANCHEZ SANCHEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons for Malbec Restaurant, #3 Summons Summons for Felix Nelson Ayala)(Amster, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SANCHEZ SANCHEZ v. ULTIMO, LLC D/B/A MALBEC RESTAURANT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAN SANCHEZ SANCHEZ
Represented By: Michael K. Amster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FELIX NELSON AYALA, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ULTIMO, LLC D/B/A MALBEC RESTAURANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ULTIMO, LLC
Represented By: Michael E. Veve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ULTIMO, LLC doing business as MALBEC RESTAURANT
Represented By: Michael E. Veve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?