SALMONS v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Plaintiff: LISA SALMONS
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Case Number: 1:2019cv03253
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to Complaint #1 due by 1/10/2020. (dot)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 , #9 , and #10 Motions for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice with respect to Turner A. Broughton, Amanda H. Bird, and Lazaro Fernandez Jr. in order for them to appear as counsel for Defendant, CONTINGENT on said attorneys filing a declaration certifying familiarity with this Court's Local Rules by no later than JANUARY 6, 2020. Counsel shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12-12-2019. (lcckk3)
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lazaro Fernandez, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6641824. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Anikeeff, Anthony)
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Amanda H. Bird, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6641796. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Anikeeff, Anthony)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Turner A. Broughton, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6641725. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Turner Broughton, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Anikeeff, Anthony)
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Hotchkiss Anikeeff on behalf of All Defendants (Anikeeff, Anthony)
December 12, 2019 NOTICE OF ERROR re #5 Notice of Appearance; emailed to aanikeeff@williamsmullen.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Counsel should update address through Pacer. (ztd, )
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendant's #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendant's Answer is due December 30, 2019. Defendant requests an extension because defense counsel was only recently retained and has plans to travel for the upcoming holidays. Defense counsel requires additional time to confer with Amtrak and craft an appropriate response. Defendant's Motion is GRANTED. Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Complaint is due JANUARY 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12-12-2019. (lcckk3)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint, Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Regarding Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint)(Anikeeff, Anthony)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Hotchkiss Anikeeff on behalf of All Defendants (Anikeeff, Anthony)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE by LISA SALMONS. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) waiver sent on 10/31/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Rathod, Jason)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/6/19. (DM)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
October 30, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zrdj)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6487786) filed by LISA SALMONS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Rathod, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SALMONS v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA SALMONS
Represented By: Jason Samuel Rathod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Represented By: Anthony Hotchkiss Anikeeff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?