MAJOR, LINDSEY & AFRICA, LLC v. DRAKE et al
Plaintiff: Major, Lindsey & Africa, LLC
Defendant: Mlegal Group, Inc. and Lauren Drake
Case Number: 1:2019cv03294
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Plaintiff's #17 Notice of Dismissal With Prejudice, this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice. The hearing on Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction scheduled for December 2, 2019, is hereby VACATED. Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/22/2019. (lctnm2)
November 22, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Dismissal With Prejudice by MAJOR, LINDSEY & AFRICA, LLC re #1 Complaint (Kennedy, Paul)
November 15, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 11/22/2019. (hmc)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' #16 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before November 22, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/15/2019. (lctnm2)
November 14, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by LAUREN DRAKE, MLEGAL GROUP, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clifford, John)
November 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by John David Clifford on behalf of All Defendants (Clifford, John)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Leslie E. Silverman. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/13/2019. (lctnm2)
November 12, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Leslie E. Silverman, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6551519. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LAUREN DRAKE, MLEGAL GROUP, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leslie E. Silverman in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission of Attorney Leslie E. Silverman Pro Hac Vice)(Fortney, David)
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MLEGAL GROUP, INC. (Fortney, David)
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Fortney on behalf of All Defendants (Fortney, David)
November 12, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Proof of service due by 11/14/2019; plaintiff's reply, if any, to defendants' response to plaintiff's #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 11/26/2019; Motion Hearing scheduled for 12/2/2019; at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (tg)
November 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing by MAJOR, LINDSEY & AFRICA, LLC re #8 Request for Summons to Issue (Attachments: #1 Summons Proof of Service)(Kennedy, Paul)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's #10 Motion for Hearing. The Court will hold a hearing on Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction on December 2, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2, before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Plaintiff is directed to file proof of service with the Court on or before November 14, 2019. Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction no later than seven days after service. Plaintiff shall file its reply, if any, on or before November 26, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/8/2019. (lctnm2)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Hearing re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by MAJOR, LINDSEY & AFRICA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Paul)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to LAUREN DRAKE, MLEGAL GROUP, INC.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent) (ztth)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to MLegal Group, Inc. re #1 Complaint filed by MAJOR, LINDSEY & AFRICA, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by MAJOR, LINDSEY & AFRICA, LLC.(Kennedy, Paul)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to Lauren Drake re #1 Complaint filed by MAJOR, LINDSEY & AFRICA, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by MAJOR, LINDSEY & AFRICA, LLC.(Kennedy, Paul)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Tobias on behalf of MAJOR, LINDSEY & AFRICA, LLC (Tobias, Bradley)
November 1, 2019 SUMMONS Not Issued as to LAUREN DRAKE, MLEGAL GROUP, INC. (zmc)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 ERRATA re Corrected Civil Cover Sheet by MAJOR, LINDSEY & AFRICA, LLC #1 Complaint filed by MAJOR, LINDSEY & AFRICA, LLC. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kennedy, Paul)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/1/2019. (lctnm2)
November 1, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmc)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Major, Lindsey & Africa, LLC (Kennedy, Paul)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Major, Lindsey & Africa, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Paul)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against Lauren Drake, Mlegal Group, Inc. (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by Major, Lindsey & Africa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kennedy, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAJOR, LINDSEY & AFRICA, LLC v. DRAKE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mlegal Group, Inc.
Represented By: David Fortney
Represented By: John David Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Drake
Represented By: David Fortney
Represented By: John David Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Major, Lindsey & Africa, LLC
Represented By: Paul J. Kennedy
Represented By: Bradley Tobias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?