THAYER v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
Plaintiff: ANDY THAYER
Defendant: U.S. SECRET SERVICE and U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2019cv03325
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/12/2020. (hmc)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' #10 Joint Status Report, that the parties file, by February 12, 2020, a further joint status report including whether disputes between the parties remain and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 3, 2020. (lcbah2)
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (McBride, Patricia)
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/13/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/13/2019. (Topic, Matthew)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/13/2019. (Topic, Matthew)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. SECRET SERVICE served on 11/12/2019 (Topic, Matthew)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 11/12/2019 (Topic, Matthew)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. SECRET SERVICE.(McBride, Patricia)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 6, 2019. (lcbah2)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. SECRET SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
November 5, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zmc)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of ANDY THAYER (Topic, Matthew)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. SECRET SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6507073) filed by ANDY THAYER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)(Topic, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THAYER v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. SECRET SERVICE
Represented By: Patricia K. McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Patricia K. McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDY THAYER
Represented By: Matthew Topic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?