SILVERXIS INC. v. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES et al
Plaintiff: SILVERXIS INC.
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI and U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Case Number: 1:2019cv03338
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SILVERXIS INC. re #3 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA re Document 3-1. (Rosen, Adam)
November 19, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SILVERXIS INC. re #2 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests . (Rosen, Adam)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI served on 11/14/2019 (Rosen, Adam)
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 11/14/2019 (Rosen, Adam)
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/13/2019. (Rosen, Adam)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/13/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/12/2020. (Rosen, Adam)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SILVERXIS INC. re #4 Order re Document 4. (Rosen, Adam)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 8, 2019. (lcbah3)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
November 6, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zmc)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SILVERXIS INC. (Rosen, Adam)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number DCDC-6510088) filed by SILVERXIS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons for U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, #6 Summons for Acting Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, #7 Summons for U.S. Attorney General William Barr, #8 Summons for Civil Process Clerk, U.S. Attorney)(Rosen, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SILVERXIS INC. v. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SILVERXIS INC.
Represented By: Adam Joseph Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?