PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY et al v. ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: EDGEWOOD MANAGEMENT CORPORATION and PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: CAPPER SENIOR I, LP, FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY and ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv03384
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by EDGEWOOD MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY (Ward, Margaret)
December 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/9/2020. (tb)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting Unopposed #4 Motion for Deadlines. Defendants Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company and Capper Senior I, LP shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by January 9, 2020. Going forward the parties shall ensure that the ECF entry accurately reflects all parties on behalf of whom a pleading is filed. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/12/19. (DJS)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by CAPPER SENIOR I, LP (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Beck, David)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CAPPER SENIOR I, LP served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019; ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019; FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019 (Ward, Margaret)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CAPPER SENIOR I, LP, ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
November 12, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zrdj)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6525420) filed by PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, EDGEWOOD MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Ward, Margaret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY et al v. ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPPER SENIOR I, LP
Represented By: David Lee Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDGEWOOD MANAGEMENT CORPORATION
Represented By: Margaret Fonshell Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Margaret Fonshell Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?