AMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Plaintiff: AMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Defendant: U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Case Number: 1:2019cv03421
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadline: The Parties shall confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before 1/20/2020. (zad)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this Freedom of Information Act case are a Complaint and an Answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) appear to be inapplicable. It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before January 20, 2020. The Joint Status Report shall address: (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the Parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 20, 2019. (lccjn1)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES.(Taaffe, Damon)
December 12, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer to Complaint due by 12/20/2019. (zcdw)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. After review of Defendant's #6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and that Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before December 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 12, 2019. (lccjn1)
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Taaffe, Damon)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/14/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/14/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/19/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 11/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Wood, Hart)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Taaffe, Damon)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
November 14, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zmc)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Wood, Hart)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6558641) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons USAO, #3 Summons U.S. Att'y General, #4 Summons U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E)(Wood, Hart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Represented By: Hart W. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: Damon William Taaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?