PHOENIX HERPETOLOGICAL SOCIETY, INC. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
Plaintiff: PHOENIX HERPETOLOGICAL SOCIETY, INC.
Defendant: MARGARET EVERSON, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, DAVID BERNHARDT and U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Case Number: 1:2019cv03450
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE served on 12/9/2019 (Coles, Frederick)
December 7, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DAVID BERNHARDT served on 12/6/2019 (Coles, Frederick) (Main Document 10 replaced on 12/9/2019) (zjf).
December 7, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MARGARET EVERSON served on 12/6/2019 (Coles, Frederick)
December 7, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/6/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/4/2020. (Coles, Frederick) (Main Document 8 replaced on 12/9/2019) (zjf).
December 7, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/06/2019. (Coles, Frederick) (Main Document 7 replaced on 12/9/2019) (zjf).
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (eg)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service filed by PHOENIX HERPETOLOGICAL SOCIETY, INC..(Coles, Frederick)
November 21, 2019 SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (zmc)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DAVID BERNHARDT, MARGARET EVERSON, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
November 21, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmc)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 ERRATA to Correct Caption of Complaint and to Correct 4 Summons to be issued by the Clerk of the Court by PHOENIX HERPETOLOGICAL SOCIETY, INC. #1 Complaint, filed by PHOENIX HERPETOLOGICAL SOCIETY, INC.. (Coles, Frederick)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by DAVID BERNHARDT, MARGARET EVERSON, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. Case related to Case No. 17-cv-2584. (zmc)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DAVID BERNHARDT, MARGARET EVERSON, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6567042) filed by PHOENIX HERPETOLOGICAL SOCIETY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice to Counsel/Party of Related Civil Case, #3 Summons William Barr, #4 Summons Jessie Liu, #5 Summons David Bernhardt, #6 Summons Margaret Everson)(Coles, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHOENIX HERPETOLOGICAL SOCIETY, INC. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHOENIX HERPETOLOGICAL SOCIETY, INC.
Represented By: Frederick Coles, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARGARET EVERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID BERNHARDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?