LIPNICK et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: DALE A LIPNICK, WILLIAM C LIPNICK, WILLIAM C. LIPNICK and DALE A. LIPNICK
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv03451
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jill E. Misener. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/2/2019. (lcjeb3)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
November 19, 2019 Case assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zmc)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 ERRATA CORRECTING CAPTION OF COMPLAINT by DALE A LIPNICK #1 Complaint,, filed by DALE A LIPNICK, WILLIAM C LIPNICK. (Glasner, Ariel)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jill E. Misener, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6567643. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DALE A LIPNICK, WILLIAM C LIPNICK (Glasner, Ariel)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WILLIAM C. LIPNICK AND DALE A. LIPNICK against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6567336) filed by WILLIAM C LIPNICK, DALE A LIPNICK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to AG William Barr, #3 Summons to DC USA Jessie K, Kiu, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J)(Glasner, Ariel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIPNICK et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DALE A LIPNICK
Represented By: Ariel S. Glasner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM C LIPNICK
Represented By: Ariel S. Glasner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM C. LIPNICK
Represented By: Ariel S. Glasner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DALE A. LIPNICK
Represented By: Ariel S. Glasner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?