MALIK v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Plaintiff: Khiry Malik
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Case Number: 1:2019cv03454
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by AUSTIN PLUMMER, KHIRY MALIK, CARLTON J. HARRIS, DON PERROW (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Moss Report, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Claiborne, William)
January 8, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE re #11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for discovery filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Finkhousen, Aaron)
January 6, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/11/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (lsj)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER setting the Initial Scheduling Conference for Tuesday, February 11, 2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 27A. See full Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 01/06/2020. (lccrc3)
December 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE to the Court re MOTION to Consolidate Cases for discovery filed in 17cv883 & 17-884 by AUSTIN PLUMMER, KHIRY MALIK, CARLTON J. HARRIS, DON PERROW (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Moss report, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Claiborne, William) Modified on 12/30/2019 to correct docket event/text (jf).
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #7 Notice of Related Case, #8 Errata filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Finkhousen, Aaron)
December 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 12/13/2019 (lsj)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The District of Columbia is hereby ORDERED to respond to Plaintiff's #7 Notice of Related Case and inform the Court of its position as to whether the cases listed in the Plaintiff's Notice (and #8 Errata) are related under this Court's Local Rules. See LCvR 40.5. The District shall file its Response on or before Friday, December 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/9/2019. (lccrc3)
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA.(Finkhousen, Aaron)
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 ERRATA Notice of Related Cases by KHIRY MALIK #7 Notice of Related Case filed by KHIRY MALIK. (Claiborne, William)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by KHIRY MALIK. Case related to Case No. 15-161 (ABJ). (Claiborne, William)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading is due December 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/16/2019. (lccrc3)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zmc)
November 25, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmc)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 ERRATA by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA #1 Notice of Removal, filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Attachments: #1 Errata)(Finkhousen, Aaron)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Finkhousen, Aaron)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA re #2 Complaint, #1 Notice of Removal, . (Finkhousen, Aaron)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Exhibits re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Finkhousen, Aaron)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District of Columbia Superior Court, case number 2019 CA 006650 B (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Removal)(Finkhousen, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MALIK v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Aaron Josiah Finkhousen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khiry Malik
Represented By: William Charles Cole Claiborne, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?