CREMADES GARCIA et al v. HOET LINARES et al
Plaintiff: FRANCISCO JAVIER CREMADES GARCA and FRANCISCO JAVIER CREMADES GARCIA
Defendant: GARRY E. HUNTER, IRIS JONES, WORLD JURIST ASSOCIATION and FRANKLIN HOET LINARES
Case Number: 1:2019cv03500
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties must file a report informing the Court of the status of the matter on 3/2/2020 if plaintiff has not filed a motion for approval of the derivative settlement by that time. (jth)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #19 Motion to Stay. The case is hereby stayed in full, including defendants' responses to the motion for preliminary injunction and complaint, until March 2, 2020. It is further ORDERED that the parties must file a report informing the Court of the status of the matter on March 2, 2020 if plaintiff has not filed a motion for approval of the derivative settlement by that time. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/15/2020. (lcabj3)
January 14, 2020 Filing 19 Consent MOTION to Stay Civil Proceeding for Forty-Five Days by GARRY E. HUNTER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flint, Justin)
January 6, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT Regarding Attempted Service on Franklin Hoet Linares by FRANCISCO JAVIER CREMADES GARCIA, FRANCISCO JAVIER CREMADES GARCIA(Derivatively on Behalf of Nominal Defendant, WORLD JURIST ASSOCIATION). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Kovel, David)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant Jones must file a response to the complaint by January 16, 2020, if the matter has not settled by then. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/6/2020. (lcabj3)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants must file a response to the #14 motion for a preliminary injunction by January 16, 2020, if the matter has not settled by then. If in the course of settlement negotiations, the parties determine they would benefit from the assistance of a neutral mediator, they may contact chambers for a referral to a Magistrate Judge or the Court's Mediation Program. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/3/2020. (lcabj3)
January 3, 2020 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by GARRY E. HUNTER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flint, Justin)
December 27, 2019 Filing 16 ERRATA as to AFFIDAVIT Regarding Attempted Service by FRANCISCO JAVIER CREMADES GARCIA, FRANCISCO JAVIER CREMADES GARCIA(Derivatively on Behalf of Nominal Defendant, WORLD JURIST ASSOCIATION) #13 Affidavit,,, filed by FRANCISCO JAVIER CREMADES GARCIA. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Document)(Kovel, David)
December 26, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION (Stipulation) for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint by FRANCISCO JAVIER CREMADES GARCIA, FRANCISCO JAVIER CREMADES GARCIA(Derivatively on Behalf of Nominal Defendant, WORLD JURIST ASSOCIATION). (Kovel, David) Modified on 12/27/2019 to correct docket event/text (jf).
December 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadline: Defendant World Jurist Association must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 2/18/2020. (jth)
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Garry Hunter must answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint no later than January 16, 2020. Defendant World Jurist Association must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by February 18, 2020. Furthermore, defendants must file a written response, which may be joint, to the motion for preliminary injunction #14 by January 7, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/24/2019. (lcabj2)
December 23, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by FRANCISCO JAVIER CREMADES GARCIA, FRANCISCO JAVIER CREMADES GARCIA(Derivatively on Behalf of Nominal Defendant, WORLD JURIST ASSOCIATION) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Declaration of Javier Cremades, #4 Exhibit Cremades Exhibits 1-34, #5 Declaration of Yachenka Rodriguez, #6 Exhibit Rodriguez Exhibits 1-2, #7 Declaration of Kim Quarles, #8 Exhibit Quarles Exhibits 1-4, #9 Declaration of Jorge Neri, #10 Declaration of Juan Luis Cebrian, #11 Declaration of Antonio Poncioni, #12 Declaration of Javier Lara Pelaez, #13 Declaration of Maria Eugenia Gay Rosell, #14 Declaration of Angel Junquera)(Kovel, David)
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT Regarding Attempted Service by FRANCISCO JAVIER CREMADES GARCIA, FRANCISCO JAVIER CREMADES GARCIA(Derivatively on Behalf of Nominal Defendant, WORLD JURIST ASSOCIATION). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registered Agent Information as to Nominal Defendant World Jurist Association, #2 Exhibit Minutes of the Board Meeting in Washington, D.C., #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Due Diligence as to Nominal Defendant World Jurist Association, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Due Diligence as to Defendant Franklin Hoet, #5 Exhibit Affidavit of Due Diligence as to Defendant Garry Hunter, #6 Exhibit Affidavit of Due Diligence as to Defendant Iris Jones, #7 Exhibit Biography of Jeremy Sharpe, #8 Exhibit Carroll-Sharpe Email Chain, #9 Exhibit Carroll-Sharpe Email Chain, #10 Exhibit Waiver of Service as to Nominal Defendant World Jurist Association)(Kovel, David)
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by GARRY E. HUNTER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flint, Justin)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Michael Flint on behalf of GARRY E. HUNTER (Flint, Justin)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. IRIS JONES served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/25/2019 (Kovel, David)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GARRY E. HUNTER served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/25/2019 (Kovel, David)
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance- Pro Bono by David E Kovel on behalf of FRANCISCO JAVIER CREMADES GARCIA, FRANCISCO JAVIER CREMADES GARCIA(Derivatively on Behalf of Nominal Defendant, WORLD JURIST ASSOCIATION) (Kovel, David)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to WORLD JURIST ASSOCIATION. (jf)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 ERRATA as to COMPLAINT for Derivative and Direct Claims by FRANCISCO JAVIER CREMADES GARCIA, FRANCISCO JAVIER CREMADES GARCIA(Derivatively on Behalf of Nominal Defendant, WORLD JURIST ASSOCIATION). (Lerner, Karen)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE as to WORLD JURIST ASSOCIATION filed by FRANCISCO JAVIER CREMADES GARCIA, FRANCISCO JAVIER CREMADES GARCIA(Derivatively on Behalf of Nominal Defendant, WORLD JURIST ASSOCIATION).(Lerner, Karen)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave of David E. Kovel to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/26/19. (DMK)
November 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David E. Kovel, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6589619. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FRANCISCO JAVIER CREMADES GARCIA, FRANCISCO JAVIER CREMADES GARCIA(Derivatively on Behalf of Nominal Defendant, WORLD JURIST ASSOCIATION) (Braun, Robert)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance- Pro Bono by Karen M. Lerner on behalf of FRANCISCO JAVIER CREMADES GARCIA, FRANCISCO JAVIER CREMADES GARCIA(Derivatively on Behalf of Nominal Defendant, WORLD JURIST ASSOCIATION) (Lerner, Karen)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FRANKLIN HOET LINARES, GARRY E. HUNTER, IRIS JONES. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
November 22, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zmc)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FRANKLIN HOET LINARES, GARRY E. HUNTER, IRIS JONES, WORLD JURIST ASSOCIATION with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6580349) filed by FRANCISCO JAVIER CREMADES GARCA, FRANCISCO JAVIER CREMADES GARCA(Derivatively on Behalf of Nominal Defendant). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Braun, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CREMADES GARCIA et al v. HOET LINARES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCO JAVIER CREMADES GARCA
Represented By: Robert Abraham Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCO JAVIER CREMADES GARCIA
Represented By: David E Kovel
Represented By: Karen M. Lerner
Represented By: Robert Abraham Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARRY E. HUNTER
Represented By: Justin Michael Flint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRIS JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WORLD JURIST ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANKLIN HOET LINARES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?