CAPITAL HEALTH SYSTEM INC. et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: PROSPECT EAST ORANGE GENERAL HOSPITAL, VIRTUA WEST JERSEY HEALTH SYSTEM INC., HOLY NAME MEDICAL CENTER, INC., HMH HOSPITALS CORPORATION, SOUTH NASSAU COMMUNITIES HOSPITAL, VIRTUA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF BURLINGTON COUNTY, INC., ATLANTICARE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL, EPISCOPAL HEALTH SERVICES, INC., INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTERS, INC., KENNEDY UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC., ENGLEWOOD HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER, INC., CAPITAL HEALTH SYSTEM INC., PROSPECT EAST ORANGE GENERAL HOSPITAL doing business as EAST ORANGE GENERAL HOSPITAL, CAPITAL HEALTH SYSTEM INC. doing business as CAPITAL HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER - HOPEWELL, INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTERS, INC. doing business as SOUTH JERSEY HEALTHCARE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER doing business as INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTER VINELAND doing business as SOUTH JERSEY HOSPITAL, SOUTH NASSAU COMMUNITIES HOSPITAL doing business as MOUNT SINAI SOUTH NASSAU, ENGLEWOOD HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as ENGLEWOOD HOSPITAL, HOLY NAME MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as HOLY NAME HOSPITAL, EPISCOPAL HEALTH SERVICES, INC. doing business as ST. JOHN'S EPISCOPAL HOSPITAL SOUTH, CAPITAL HEALTH SYSTEM INC. doing business as CAPITAL HEALTH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, KENNEDY UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC. doing business as JEFFERSON CHERRY HILL HOSPITAL doing business as KENNEDY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL doing business as JEFFERSON STRATFORD HOSPITAL, HMH HOSPITALS CORPORATION doing business as JERSEY SHORE UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL doing business as SBH HEALTH SYSTEM, VIRTUA WEST JERSEY HEALTH SYSTEM INC. doing business as VIRTUA VOORHEES HOSPITAL doing business as WEST JERSEY HOSPITAL, VIRTUA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF BURLINGTON COUNTY, INC. doing business as VIRTUA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL doing business as MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF BURLINGTON COUNTY and HMH HOSPITALS CORPORATION doing business as RARITAN BAY MEDICAL CENTER
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv03504
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Holloway on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Holloway, James)
December 30, 2019 Case directly reassigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson pursuant to the Minute Order dated 12/20/19. Judge Randolph D. Moss is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
December 20, 2019 Cases Consolidated. Cases 19cv3504 has been consolidated with case 19mc190, pursuant to an Order entered 12/20/2019. From this date forward, all pleadings shall be filed ONLY in 19mc190 (jf)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court has reviewed the December 18, 2019 notice of related case filed by defendant in Capital Health System Inc. v. Azar, 19-cv-03504-RDM, the stated grounds for plaintiffs' objections to the notice and consolidation, and the pleadings in the case, and it is persuaded that the case falls squarely within the order of consolidation entered on November 4, 2019. Therefore, the Clerk of Court is directed to transfer Capital Health System, Inc. v. Azar, 19-cv-03504-RDM, to this Court with the consent of the judge currently assigned. The Clerk of Court is further direct to consolidate the case into In re Allina II-Type DSH Adjustment Cases, 19-mc-190. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/20/19. (DMK)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALEX M. AZAR, II. Case related to Case No. 19-mc-190. (Bryce, Peter)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Bryce on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Bryce, Peter)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/22/2019. (lcrdm2, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
November 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zrdj)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ATLANTICARE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., CAPITAL HEALTH SYSTEM INC., ENGLEWOOD HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER, INC., EPISCOPAL HEALTH SERVICES, INC., HMH HOSPITALS CORPORATION, HOLY NAME MEDICAL CENTER, INC., INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTERS, INC., KENNEDY UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC., PROSPECT EAST ORANGE GENERAL HOSPITAL, SOUTH NASSAU COMMUNITIES HOSPITAL, ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL, VIRTUA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF BURLINGTON COUNTY, INC., VIRTUA WEST JERSEY HEALTH SYSTEM INC. (Glazer, Joseph)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6581942) filed by VIRTUA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF BURLINGTON COUNTY, INC., HMH HOSPITALS CORPORATION, INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTERS, INC., EPISCOPAL HEALTH SERVICES, INC., ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL, CAPITAL HEALTH SYSTEM INC., KENNEDY UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC., VIRTUA WEST JERSEY HEALTH SYSTEM INC., PROSPECT EAST ORANGE GENERAL HOSPITAL, ATLANTICARE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., SOUTH NASSAU COMMUNITIES HOSPITAL, ENGLEWOOD HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER, INC., HOLY NAME MEDICAL CENTER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9/25/19 EJR Letter, #2 Exhibit 9/30/19 EJR Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Azar, #5 Summons Attorney General, #6 Summons US Attorney)(Glazer, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAPITAL HEALTH SYSTEM INC. et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROSPECT EAST ORANGE GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIRTUA WEST JERSEY HEALTH SYSTEM INC.
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOLY NAME MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HMH HOSPITALS CORPORATION
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTH NASSAU COMMUNITIES HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIRTUA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF BURLINGTON COUNTY, INC.
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATLANTICARE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EPISCOPAL HEALTH SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTERS, INC.
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNEDY UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC.
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENGLEWOOD HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAPITAL HEALTH SYSTEM INC.
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROSPECT EAST ORANGE GENERAL HOSPITAL doing business as EAST ORANGE GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAPITAL HEALTH SYSTEM INC. doing business as CAPITAL HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER - HOPEWELL
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTERS, INC. doing business as SOUTH JERSEY HEALTHCARE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER doing business as INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTER VINELAND doing business as SOUTH JERSEY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTH NASSAU COMMUNITIES HOSPITAL doing business as MOUNT SINAI SOUTH NASSAU
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENGLEWOOD HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as ENGLEWOOD HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOLY NAME MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as HOLY NAME HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EPISCOPAL HEALTH SERVICES, INC. doing business as ST. JOHN'S EPISCOPAL HOSPITAL SOUTH
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAPITAL HEALTH SYSTEM INC. doing business as CAPITAL HEALTH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNEDY UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC. doing business as JEFFERSON CHERRY HILL HOSPITAL doing business as KENNEDY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL doing business as JEFFERSON STRATFORD HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HMH HOSPITALS CORPORATION doing business as JERSEY SHORE UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL doing business as SBH HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIRTUA WEST JERSEY HEALTH SYSTEM INC. doing business as VIRTUA VOORHEES HOSPITAL doing business as WEST JERSEY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIRTUA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF BURLINGTON COUNTY, INC. doing business as VIRTUA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL doing business as MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF BURLINGTON COUNTY
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HMH HOSPITALS CORPORATION doing business as RARITAN BAY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Peter M. Bryce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?