NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL v. NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE
Plaintiff: NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL
Defendant: NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE
Case Number: 1:2019cv03535
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE.(Peterson, Benton)
January 13, 2020 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/9/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Vissers, Elizabeth)
January 13, 2020 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE served on 12/2/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Vissers, Elizabeth)
January 13, 2020 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/02/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Vissers, Elizabeth)
December 23, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/17/2019. (tj)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting in part #11 Defendant's motion for extension of time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its response to the complaint in this matter on or before January 17, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on December 20, 2019. (lcrc3)
December 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton)
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara J. Chisholm on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Chisholm, Barbara)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Vissers on behalf of NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL (Vissers, Elizabeth)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Drevet John Hunt on behalf of NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL (Hunt, Drevet)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that Barbara J. Chisholm is admitted to represent Plaintiff pro hac vice in this case. SO ORDERED. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on November 27, 2019. ( lcrc3)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Barbara J. Chisholm, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6600873. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL (Attachments: #1 Declaration Second Declaration of Barbara J. Chisholm in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammer, Rebecca)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), an attorney seeking to appear pro hac vice before this Court must submit a declaration that sets forth: "(1) the full name of the attorney; (2) the attorney's office address and telephone number; (3) a list of all bars to which the attorney has been admitted; (4) a certification that the attorney either has or has not been disciplined by any bar, and if the attorney has been disciplined by any bar, the circumstances and details of the discipline; (5) the number of times the attorney has been admitted pro hac vice in this Court within the last two years; and (6) whether the attorney, if the attorney engages in the practice of law from an office located in the District of Columbia, is a member of the District of Columbia Bar or has an application for membership pending." The declaration in support of #4 does not fully comply with element (5) of this rule because it does not list the number of times the applicant has been admitted pro hac vice in this Court within the last two years. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on November 26, 2019. (lcrc3)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that Elizabeth Vissers is admitted to represent Plaintiff pro hac vice in this case. SO ORDERED. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on November 26, 2019. (lcrc3)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that Drevet J. Hunt is admitted to represent Plaintiff pro hac vice in this case. SO ORDERED. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on November 26, 2019. (lcrc3)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Drevet J. Hunt, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6595682. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammer, Rebecca)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Elizabeth Vissers, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6595674. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammer, Rebecca)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Barbara J. Chisholm, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6595595. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammer, Rebecca)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent) (ztth)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Corrected Summons re #1 Complaint, filed by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL.(Hammer, Rebecca)
November 25, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6589082) filed by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)(Hammer, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL v. NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE
Represented By: Benton Gregory Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL
Represented By: Rebecca Hammer
Represented By: Barbara J. Chisholm
Represented By: Elizabeth Vissers
Represented By: Drevet John Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?