SHARPERSON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Plaintiff: LATEEF SHARPERSON
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Case Number: 1:2019cv03560
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Mandamus & Other (Other)
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Withdraw Submission. The court construes Plaintiff's Motion as a motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). Plaintiff's action is thus dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/23/2020. (lcapm3)
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 1/10/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/10/2020. (jf)
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw Submission by LATEEF SHARPERSON (eg)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (adh, )
December 23, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zmd)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $46.16 from Prison Account of LATEEF SHARPERSON and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/19/2019. (zmd)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by LATEEF SHARPERSON. (zmd)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LATEEF SHARPERSON. (zmd)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by LATEEF SHARPERSON. (zmd)
November 25, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 11/25/19. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHARPERSON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LATEEF SHARPERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?