AHMC GARFIELD MEDICAL CENTER, LP et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: BARNES JEWISH HOSPITAL, BANNER - UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER PHOENIX, BETHESDA HEALTH, INC., AHMC WHITTIER HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, CHRISTUS HEALTH GULF COAST, AHMC GREATER EL MONTE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, CH ALLIED SERVICES, INC., BANNER IRONWOOD MEDICAL CENTER, BEVERLY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, BAYLOR REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AT GRAPEVINE, BARTOW REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BAYLOR HEART & VASCULAR CENTER LLP, BAYLOR MEDICAL CENTER AT IRVING, ALHAMBRA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, LP, CGH MEDICAL CENTER, BLUE RIDGE GEORGIA HOSPITAL COMPANY, INC., AHMC GARFIELD MEDICAL CENTER, LP, BAYLOR UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, BAYLOR MEDICAL CENTER AT WAXAHACHIE, AU MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BARNES JEWISH WEST COUNTY HOSPITAL, ANAHEIM MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, BRUNSWICK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, LLC, BLUE ISLAND HOSPITAL, LLC, BAYLOR REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AT CARROLLTON, BAYLOR REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AT PLANO, CAPE CANAVERAL HOSPITAL, INC., BANNER DESERT MEDICAL CENTER, ALTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, AHMC SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER HEART HOSPITAL, CITY HOSPITAL, INC., BAYLOR MEDICAL CENTERS AT GARLAND AND MCKINNEY, BIG SPRING HOSPITAL CORPORATION, AHMC MONTEREY PARK HOSPITAL, LP, CAMDEN CLARK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER - GARLAND, BLUE MOUNTAIN HOSPITAL, BANNER HEALTH, BANNER PHARMACY SERVICES LLC, BANNER BOSWELL MEDICAL CENTER, BRISTOL HOSPITAL, INC, CHRISTIAN HOSPITAL NORTHEAST - NORTHWEST, BANNER GOLDFIELD MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER GATEWAY MEDICAL CENTER, BAYLOR ALL SAINTS MEDICAL CENTER, BARNES JEWISH ST PETERS HOSPITAL, INC., BANNER - UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, ALL PLAINTIFFS, AHMC GREATER EL MONTE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL doing business as GREATER EL MONTE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, AU MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as AUGUSTA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER HEALTH doing business as BANNER CASA GRANDE MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER HEALTH doing business as BANNER FORT COLLINS MEDICAL CENTER, CHRISTUS HEALTH GULF COAST doing business as CHRISTUS ST. JOHN HOSPITAL, BETHESDA HEALTH, INC. doing business as BETHESDA HOSPITAL EAST, BANNER - UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER doing business as BANNER BAYWOOD MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER PHARMACY SERVICES LLC doing business as BANNER UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER TUCSON, ALHAMBRA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, LP doing business as ALHAMBRA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, CH ALLIED SERVICES, INC. doing business as BOONE HOSPITAL CENTER, BLUE RIDGE GEORGIA HOSPITAL COMPANY, INC. doing business as FANNIN REGIONAL HOSPITAL, BEVERLY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION doing business as BEVERLY HOSPITAL, CAMDEN CLARK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION doing business as CAMDEN CLARK MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER BOSWELL MEDICAL CENTER doing business as BANNER THUNDERBIRD MEDICAL CENTER, BAYLOR HEART & VASCULAR CENTER LLP doing business as BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE HEART AND VASCULAR HOSPITAL - DALLAS, BRUNSWICK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as NOVANT HEALTH BRUNSWICK MEDICAL CENTER, AHMC SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER doing business as SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, CHRISTIAN HOSPITAL NORTHEAST - NORTHWEST doing business as CHRISTIAN HOSPITAL, BARNES JEWISH ST PETERS HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as BARNES-JEWISH ST PETERS HOSPITAL, BANNER HEALTH doing business as BANNER DESERT MEDICAL CENTER, AHMC WHITTIER HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER doing business as WHITTIER HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAYLOR MEDICAL CENTER AT WAXAHACHIE doing business as BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER - WAXAHACHIE, CITY HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as BERKELEY MEDICAL CENTER, CAPE CANAVERAL HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as HEALTH FIRST CAPE CANAVERAL HOSPITAL, BAYLOR MEDICAL CENTERS AT GARLAND AND MCKINNEY doing business as BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER AT MCKINNEY, BIG SPRING HOSPITAL CORPORATION doing business as SCENIC MOUNTAIN MEDICAL CENTER, AHMC GARFIELD MEDICAL CENTER, LP doing business as GARFIELD MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER DESERT MEDICAL CENTER doing business as BANNER ESTRELLA MEDICAL CENTER, BLUE ISLAND HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as METROSOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, BRISTOL HOSPITAL, INC doing business as BRISTOL HOSPITAL, BLUE MOUNTAIN HOSPITAL doing business as ST. LUKE'S GNADEN HUETTEN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BAYLOR MEDICAL CENTER AT IRVING doing business as BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER - IRVING, BARTOW REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as BARTOW REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ANAHEIM MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER doing business as ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAYLOR ALL SAINTS MEDICAL CENTER doing business as BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE ALL SAINTS MEDICAL CENTER - FORT WORTH and AHMC MONTEREY PARK HOSPITAL, LP doing business as MONTEREY PARK HOSPITAL
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv03569
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1-14-2020. (lcckk3)
January 14, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holland, Liam)
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Liam Holland on behalf of All Defendants (Holland, Liam)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/2/19. (DM)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
November 27, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zrdj)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by AHMC GARFIELD MEDICAL CENTER, LP, AHMC GREATER EL MONTE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, AHMC MONTEREY PARK HOSPITAL, LP, AHMC SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, AHMC WHITTIER HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, ALHAMBRA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, LP, ALTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ANAHEIM MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, AU MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BANNER - UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER - UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER PHOENIX, BANNER BOSWELL MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER DESERT MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER GATEWAY MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER GOLDFIELD MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER HEALTH, BANNER HEART HOSPITAL, BANNER IRONWOOD MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER PHARMACY SERVICES LLC, BARNES JEWISH HOSPITAL, BARNES JEWISH ST PETERS HOSPITAL, INC., BARNES JEWISH WEST COUNTY HOSPITAL, BARTOW REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BAYLOR ALL SAINTS MEDICAL CENTER, BAYLOR HEART & VASCULAR CENTER LLP, BAYLOR MEDICAL CENTER AT IRVING, BAYLOR MEDICAL CENTER AT WAXAHACHIE, BAYLOR MEDICAL CENTERS AT GARLAND AND MCKINNEY, BAYLOR REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AT CARROLLTON, BAYLOR REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AT GRAPEVINE, BAYLOR REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AT PLANO, BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER - GARLAND, BAYLOR UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, BETHESDA HEALTH, INC., BEVERLY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, BIG SPRING HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BLUE ISLAND HOSPITAL, LLC, BLUE MOUNTAIN HOSPITAL, BLUE RIDGE GEORGIA HOSPITAL COMPANY, INC., BRISTOL HOSPITAL, INC, BRUNSWICK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, LLC, CAMDEN CLARK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CAPE CANAVERAL HOSPITAL, INC., CGH MEDICAL CENTER, CH ALLIED SERVICES, INC., CHRISTIAN HOSPITAL NORTHEAST - NORTHWEST, CHRISTUS HEALTH GULF COAST, CITY HOSPITAL, INC.. Case related to Case No. 18-02262. (Hettich, Daniel)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AHMC GARFIELD MEDICAL CENTER, LP, AHMC GREATER EL MONTE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, AHMC MONTEREY PARK HOSPITAL, LP, AHMC SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, AHMC WHITTIER HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, ALHAMBRA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, LP, ALTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ANAHEIM MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, AU MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BANNER - UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER - UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER PHOENIX, BANNER BOSWELL MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER DESERT MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER GATEWAY MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER GOLDFIELD MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER HEALTH, BANNER HEART HOSPITAL, BANNER IRONWOOD MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER PHARMACY SERVICES LLC, BARNES JEWISH HOSPITAL, BARNES JEWISH ST PETERS HOSPITAL, INC., BARNES JEWISH WEST COUNTY HOSPITAL, BARTOW REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BAYLOR ALL SAINTS MEDICAL CENTER, BAYLOR HEART & VASCULAR CENTER LLP, BAYLOR MEDICAL CENTER AT IRVING, BAYLOR MEDICAL CENTER AT WAXAHACHIE, BAYLOR MEDICAL CENTERS AT GARLAND AND MCKINNEY, BAYLOR REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AT CARROLLTON, BAYLOR REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AT GRAPEVINE, BAYLOR REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AT PLANO, BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER - GARLAND, BAYLOR UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, BETHESDA HEALTH, INC., BEVERLY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, BIG SPRING HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BLUE ISLAND HOSPITAL, LLC, BLUE MOUNTAIN HOSPITAL, BLUE RIDGE GEORGIA HOSPITAL COMPANY, INC., BRISTOL HOSPITAL, INC, BRUNSWICK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, LLC, CAMDEN CLARK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CAPE CANAVERAL HOSPITAL, INC., CGH MEDICAL CENTER, CH ALLIED SERVICES, INC., CHRISTIAN HOSPITAL NORTHEAST - NORTHWEST, CHRISTUS HEALTH GULF COAST, CITY HOSPITAL, INC. (Hettich, Daniel)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6597551) filed by BANNER PHARMACY SERVICES LLC, BANNER IRONWOOD MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER DESERT MEDICAL CENTER, BRISTOL HOSPITAL, INC, AHMC SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, BLUE RIDGE GEORGIA HOSPITAL COMPANY, INC., AHMC GARFIELD MEDICAL CENTER, LP, BANNER - UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER PHOENIX, BRUNSWICK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, LLC, AU MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BAYLOR REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AT PLANO, CAMDEN CLARK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BANNER HEALTH, CHRISTUS HEALTH GULF COAST, BAYLOR UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, BARNES JEWISH WEST COUNTY HOSPITAL, ANAHEIM MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAYLOR MEDICAL CENTER AT IRVING, BANNER GOLDFIELD MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER HEART HOSPITAL, BANNER - UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, ALHAMBRA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, LP, BAYLOR REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AT CARROLLTON, CGH MEDICAL CENTER, CH ALLIED SERVICES, INC., ALTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BANNER GATEWAY MEDICAL CENTER, CITY HOSPITAL, INC., BARNES JEWISH HOSPITAL, BLUE ISLAND HOSPITAL, LLC, AHMC GREATER EL MONTE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, AHMC WHITTIER HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAYLOR MEDICAL CENTER AT WAXAHACHIE, BETHESDA HEALTH, INC., BARTOW REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BAYLOR MEDICAL CENTERS AT GARLAND AND MCKINNEY, CHRISTIAN HOSPITAL NORTHEAST - NORTHWEST, BEVERLY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER - GARLAND, BLUE MOUNTAIN HOSPITAL, BARNES JEWISH ST PETERS HOSPITAL, INC., BAYLOR HEART & VASCULAR CENTER LLP, CAPE CANAVERAL HOSPITAL, INC., BANNER BOSWELL MEDICAL CENTER, BAYLOR ALL SAINTS MEDICAL CENTER, BIG SPRING HOSPITAL CORPORATION, AHMC MONTEREY PARK HOSPITAL, LP, BAYLOR REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AT GRAPEVINE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Hettich, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AHMC GARFIELD MEDICAL CENTER, LP et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARNES JEWISH HOSPITAL
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANNER - UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER PHOENIX
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETHESDA HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHMC WHITTIER HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTUS HEALTH GULF COAST
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHMC GREATER EL MONTE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CH ALLIED SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANNER IRONWOOD MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEVERLY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYLOR REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AT GRAPEVINE
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARTOW REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYLOR HEART & VASCULAR CENTER LLP
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYLOR MEDICAL CENTER AT IRVING
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALHAMBRA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, LP
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CGH MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLUE RIDGE GEORGIA HOSPITAL COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHMC GARFIELD MEDICAL CENTER, LP
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYLOR UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYLOR MEDICAL CENTER AT WAXAHACHIE
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AU MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARNES JEWISH WEST COUNTY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANAHEIM MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUNSWICK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLUE ISLAND HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYLOR REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AT CARROLLTON
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYLOR REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AT PLANO
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAPE CANAVERAL HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANNER DESERT MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHMC SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANNER HEART HOSPITAL
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYLOR MEDICAL CENTERS AT GARLAND AND MCKINNEY
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BIG SPRING HOSPITAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHMC MONTEREY PARK HOSPITAL, LP
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAMDEN CLARK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER - GARLAND
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLUE MOUNTAIN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANNER HEALTH
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANNER PHARMACY SERVICES LLC
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANNER BOSWELL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRISTOL HOSPITAL, INC
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTIAN HOSPITAL NORTHEAST - NORTHWEST
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANNER GOLDFIELD MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANNER GATEWAY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYLOR ALL SAINTS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARNES JEWISH ST PETERS HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANNER - UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHMC GREATER EL MONTE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL doing business as GREATER EL MONTE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AU MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as AUGUSTA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANNER HEALTH doing business as BANNER CASA GRANDE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANNER HEALTH doing business as BANNER FORT COLLINS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTUS HEALTH GULF COAST doing business as CHRISTUS ST. JOHN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETHESDA HEALTH, INC. doing business as BETHESDA HOSPITAL EAST
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANNER - UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER doing business as BANNER BAYWOOD MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANNER PHARMACY SERVICES LLC doing business as BANNER UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER TUCSON
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALHAMBRA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, LP doing business as ALHAMBRA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CH ALLIED SERVICES, INC. doing business as BOONE HOSPITAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLUE RIDGE GEORGIA HOSPITAL COMPANY, INC. doing business as FANNIN REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEVERLY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION doing business as BEVERLY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAMDEN CLARK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION doing business as CAMDEN CLARK MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANNER BOSWELL MEDICAL CENTER doing business as BANNER THUNDERBIRD MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYLOR HEART & VASCULAR CENTER LLP doing business as BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE HEART AND VASCULAR HOSPITAL - DALLAS
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUNSWICK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as NOVANT HEALTH BRUNSWICK MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHMC SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER doing business as SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTIAN HOSPITAL NORTHEAST - NORTHWEST doing business as CHRISTIAN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARNES JEWISH ST PETERS HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as BARNES-JEWISH ST PETERS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANNER HEALTH doing business as BANNER DESERT MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHMC WHITTIER HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER doing business as WHITTIER HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYLOR MEDICAL CENTER AT WAXAHACHIE doing business as BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER - WAXAHACHIE
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as BERKELEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAPE CANAVERAL HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as HEALTH FIRST CAPE CANAVERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYLOR MEDICAL CENTERS AT GARLAND AND MCKINNEY doing business as BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER AT MCKINNEY
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BIG SPRING HOSPITAL CORPORATION doing business as SCENIC MOUNTAIN MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHMC GARFIELD MEDICAL CENTER, LP doing business as GARFIELD MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANNER DESERT MEDICAL CENTER doing business as BANNER ESTRELLA MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLUE ISLAND HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as METROSOUTH MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRISTOL HOSPITAL, INC doing business as BRISTOL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLUE MOUNTAIN HOSPITAL doing business as ST. LUKE'S GNADEN HUETTEN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYLOR MEDICAL CENTER AT IRVING doing business as BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER - IRVING
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARTOW REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as BARTOW REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANAHEIM MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER doing business as ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYLOR ALL SAINTS MEDICAL CENTER doing business as BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE ALL SAINTS MEDICAL CENTER - FORT WORTH
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHMC MONTEREY PARK HOSPITAL, LP doing business as MONTEREY PARK HOSPITAL
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Liam Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?