FLORIDA EB5 INVESTMENTS, LLC v. WOLF et al
Plaintiff: FLORIDA EB5 INVESTMENTS, LLC
Defendant: CHAD WOLF, EDIE PEARSON and KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI
Case Number: 1:2019cv03573
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Richard J Leon
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 1/16/2020. Motion for #2 Preliminary Injunction was Heard and Taken Under Advisement. (Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne) (jth)
January 15, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by David G Barger on behalf of FLORIDA EB5 INVESTMENTS, LLC (Barger, David)
January 3, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to opposition to motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by FLORIDA EB5 INVESTMENTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Sklaire, Michael)
December 20, 2019 Filing 15 Memorandum in opposition to re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, EDIE PEARSON, CHAD WOLF. (Girdharry, Glenn)
December 13, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI served on 12/10/2019 (Sklaire, Michael)
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EDIE PEARSON served on 12/10/2019 (Sklaire, Michael)
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHAD WOLF served on 12/10/2019 (Sklaire, Michael)
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/10/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/8/2020. (Sklaire, Michael)
December 13, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/10/2019. (Sklaire, Michael)
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, EDIE PEARSON, CHAD WOLF. Attorney William Mark Nebeker terminated. (Nebeker, William)
December 6, 2019 Minute Entry for Proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon. Status Conference held on 12/6/2019. Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (TRO) is WITHDRAWN. The #5 Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule is GRANTED. Defendants' Response to the #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is due by 12/20/2019; Plaintiff's Reply is due by 1/3/2020; A Hearing on the #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set for 1/16/2020 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter: William P. Zaremba) (jth)
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, EDIE PEARSON, CHAD WOLF, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn M. Girdharry on behalf of All Defendants (Girdharry, Glenn)
December 3, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Counsel of record for the government, Mr. William Nebeker, not present. Status Hearing continued to 12/6/2019, at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Government's Counsel William Nebeker and counsel for the Office of Immigration Litigation (OIL) must be present at the scheduled hearing. Court Reporter William Zaremba; Plaintiff's Counsel: Michael R. Sklaire; Govenment's Counsel: Patricia McBride standing for William Nebeker. (tg) Modified name of agency on 12/3/2019 (tg).
November 27, 2019 Set/Reset Hearing: A Status Conference in this case is scheduled for Tuesday, December 3, 2019, at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (jth)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that a status conference in this matter shall be held on Tuesday, December 3, 2019 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/27/19. (lcrjl2)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Complaint, filed by FLORIDA EB5 INVESTMENTS, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by FLORIDA EB5 INVESTMENTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Sklaire, Michael)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, EDIE PEARSON, CHAD WOLF (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William)
November 27, 2019 SUMMONS Not Issued as to KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, EDIE PEARSON, CHAD WOLF (zrdj)
November 27, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (zrdj)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Proposed Order by FLORIDA EB5 INVESTMENTS, LLC re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Sklaire, Michael)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FLORIDA EB5 INVESTMENTS, LLC (zrdj)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by FLORIDA EB5 INVESTMENTS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Sklaire, Michael). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 11/27/2019 (zrdj). Modified on 12/6/2019 to reflect that the Temporary Restraining Order was WITHDRAWN (jth).
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, EDIE PEARSON, CHAD WOLF ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6598072) filed by FLORIDA EB5 INVESTMENTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Cuccinelli summons, #3 Summons Pearson summons, #4 Summons Wolf summons, #5 Declaration 7.1 Disclosure)(Sklaire, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FLORIDA EB5 INVESTMENTS, LLC v. WOLF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD WOLF
Represented By: Glenn M. Girdharry
Represented By: William Mark Nebeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDIE PEARSON
Represented By: Glenn M. Girdharry
Represented By: William Mark Nebeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI
Represented By: Glenn M. Girdharry
Represented By: William Mark Nebeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLORIDA EB5 INVESTMENTS, LLC
Represented By: Michael R. Sklaire
Represented By: David G Barger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?