MCNAIR v. GOVERNMENT OF NORTH CAROLINA et al
Plaintiff: ANTHONY LEE MCNAIR
Defendant: ROY COOPER, MICHAEL T. WOOD and GOVERNMENT OF NORTH CAROLINA
Case Number: 1:2019cv03576
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT filed by ANTHONY LEE MCNAIR. (zsb)
January 10, 2020 Filing 8 TESTIMONY by ANTHONY LEE MCNAIR (zsb)
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #5 Pro Se Order Directing Prisoner Statement, filed by ANTHONY LEE MCNAIR. (zsb)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by ANTHONY LEE MCNAIR (zsb)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/19/2019. (adh, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by ANTHONY LEE MCNAIR (zsb)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by ANTHONY LEE MCNAIR (adh, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANTHONY LEE MCNAIR (adh, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROY COOPER, GOVERNMENT OF NORTH CAROLINA, MICHAEL T. WOOD with Jury Demand filed by ANTHONY LEE MCNAIR.(adh, )
November 25, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 11/25/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCNAIR v. GOVERNMENT OF NORTH CAROLINA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY LEE MCNAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROY COOPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL T. WOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOVERNMENT OF NORTH CAROLINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?