NORRIS v. KOUMANS et al
Plaintiff: ANNA NORRIS
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY and MARK KOUMANS
Case Number: 1:2019cv03583
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of All Defendants (Campbell, Rhonda)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/13/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/11/2020. (Rodriguez, Leon)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 William Barr by Certified Mail)(Rodriguez, Leon)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY served on 12/13/2019 (Attachments: #1 Christopher Wray by Certified Mail)(Rodriguez, Leon)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MARK KOUMANS served on 12/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Mark Koumans by Certified Mail)(Rodriguez, Leon)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to MARK KOUMANS, CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
November 27, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zrdj)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against MARK KOUMANS, CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6600571) filed by ANNA NORRIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to C. Wray, #3 Summons to M. Koumans, #4 Summons to W. Barr, #5 Summons to J. Liu)(Rodriguez, Leon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NORRIS v. KOUMANS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNA NORRIS
Represented By: Leon Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY
Represented By: Rhonda Lisa Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK KOUMANS
Represented By: Rhonda Lisa Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?