ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER - EAST CAMPUS, MCLAREN PORT HURON HOSPITAL, RMC ANNISTON, MCLAREN CENTRAL MICHIGAN, GREAT RIVER MEDICAL CENTER, UPPER VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, MCLAREN LAPEER REGION, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, MCLAREN MACOMB, MCLAREN BAY REGION, MIAMI VALLEY HOSPITAL, AULTMAN HOSPITAL, UNION HOSPITAL, NORTHWESTERN KISHWAUKEE HOSPITAL, MIZELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MARION GENERAL HOSPITAL, NORTH KANSAS CITY HOSPITAL, ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES, PORT HURON HOSPITAL, GWINNETT MEDICAL CENTER - LAWRENCEVILLE, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST, FREEMAN WEST, COMMUNITY WESTVIEW HOSPITAL and KARMANOS CANCER INSTITUTE
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv03617
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/27/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Green Card, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking)(Smith, N.)
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Green Card, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking)(Smith, N.)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 1/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Green Card, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking)(Smith, N.)
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
December 5, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zrdj)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:19-MC-00190-ABJ. (Smith, N.)
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER, AULTMAN HOSPITAL, BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER - EAST CAMPUS, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH, COMMUNITY WESTVIEW HOSPITAL, FREEMAN WEST, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES, GREAT RIVER MEDICAL CENTER, GWINNETT MEDICAL CENTER - LAWRENCEVILLE, KARMANOS CANCER INSTITUTE, MARION GENERAL HOSPITAL, MCLAREN BAY REGION, MCLAREN CENTRAL MICHIGAN, MCLAREN LAPEER REGION, MCLAREN MACOMB, MCLAREN PORT HURON HOSPITAL, MIAMI VALLEY HOSPITAL, MIZELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, NORTH KANSAS CITY HOSPITAL, NORTHWESTERN KISHWAUKEE HOSPITAL, PORT HURON HOSPITAL, RMC ANNISTON, UNION HOSPITAL, UPPER VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER (Smith, N.)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by N. Kent Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Smith, N.)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT UNDER THE MEDICARE ACT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6612104) filed by GWINNETT MEDICAL CENTER - LAWRENCEVILLE, NORTH KANSAS CITY HOSPITAL, FREEMAN WEST, UPPER VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, MCLAREN MACOMB, AULTMAN HOSPITAL, NORTHWESTERN KISHWAUKEE HOSPITAL, ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER, MCLAREN PORT HURON HOSPITAL, PORT HURON HOSPITAL, MCLAREN LAPEER REGION, MARION GENERAL HOSPITAL, UNION HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY WESTVIEW HOSPITAL, BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER - EAST CAMPUS, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES, KARMANOS CANCER INSTITUTE, MIZELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MCLAREN BAY REGION, MCLAREN CENTRAL MICHIGAN, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST, RMC ANNISTON, MIAMI VALLEY HOSPITAL, GREAT RIVER MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Alex Azar, #3 Summons to Jessie Liu, #4 Summons to William Barr)(Smith, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER - EAST CAMPUS
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCLAREN PORT HURON HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RMC ANNISTON
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCLAREN CENTRAL MICHIGAN
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREAT RIVER MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UPPER VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCLAREN LAPEER REGION
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCLAREN MACOMB
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCLAREN BAY REGION
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIAMI VALLEY HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AULTMAN HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNION HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTHWESTERN KISHWAUKEE HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIZELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARION GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTH KANSAS CITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PORT HURON HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GWINNETT MEDICAL CENTER - LAWRENCEVILLE
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREEMAN WEST
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY WESTVIEW HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARMANOS CANCER INSTITUTE
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?