UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. NANOTECH ENGINEERING, INC. et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Defendant: MICHAEL JAMES SWEANEY, MICHAEL HATTON, NANOTECH ENGINEERING, INC., NANOTECH FINANCE LLC, DAVID SWEANEY, JEFFERY GANGE, OMNI GOLF, LLC and 3 DRAGONS LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03633
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE REGARDING SERVICE as required by Court's Order dated 12/5/2019 (REDACTED) by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION re #5 Order on Motion for TRO,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,, (Bruckmann, Christopher)
December 9, 2019 ***Case Unsealed pursuant to Order filed 12/5/19. (ztd)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Pending the determining of plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction. It is further ORDERED that plaintiff must file a notice with the Court by 12/9/2019, indicating whether service has occurred, the time of service, and the name, phone number and address of each individual served. Defendants must show cause in writing by 12/13/2019, why a preliminary injunction pursuant to Federal Rule of Procedure 65, containing similar terms should not be issued against them. Plaintiff must file any reply by 12/17/2019. A hearing on this issue will be set for 12/19/2019 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Unless extended by this Court pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(b)(2), this Temporary Restraining Order expires on 12/19/2019. SO ORDERED. (See the order for complete details). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/5/2019. Counsel for Plaintiff has been notified electronically. (zjth)
December 5, 2019 Set/Reset Hearing: An Under Seal, Ex Parte Hearing with only counsel for the plaintiff attending is set for 12/5/2019 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jth)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Order to Show Cause by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Jeffrey R. Anderson, #3 Declaration of Pei Y. Chung (Part 1 of 4), #4 Declaration of Pei Y. Chung (Part 2 of 4), #5 Declaration of Pei Y. Chung (Part 3 of 4), #6 Declaration of Pei Y. Chung (Part 4 of 4), #7 Declaration of Lucas Jiles, #8 Rule 65 Cert., #9 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj)
December 5, 2019 Summons (7) Issued as to 3 DRAGONS LLC, JEFFERY GANGE, NANOTECH ENGINEERING, INC., NANOTECH FINANCE LLC, OMNI GOLF, LLC, DAVID SWEANEY, MICHAEL JAMES SWEANEY. (zrdj)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against 3 DRAGONS LLC, JEFFERY GANGE, NANOTECH ENGINEERING, INC., NANOTECH FINANCE LLC, OMNI GOLF, LLC, DAVID SWEANEY, MICHAEL JAMES SWEANEY with Jury Demand filed by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrdj)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion to Seal Case. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 12/5/2019. Counsel have been notified.(zrdj)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Seal Case by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. NANOTECH ENGINEERING, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL JAMES SWEANEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL HATTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANOTECH ENGINEERING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANOTECH FINANCE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID SWEANEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERY GANGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OMNI GOLF, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3 DRAGONS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By: Gregory R. Bockin
Represented By: Christopher Mark Bruckmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?