DABROWSKI v. MCALEENAN
Plaintiff: MELODY DABROWSKI
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Case Number: 1:2019cv03679
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 8:19-cv-02854. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MARGINAL ORDER Granting #7 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/5/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 12/10/2019.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Change Venue by Melody Dabrowski. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Consent Motion to Transfer Venue)(Silvers, David) [Transferred from Maryland on 12/10/2019.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 Supplemental to #5 Summons Returned Executed filed by Melody Dabrowski as to Robert K. Hur, U.S. Attorney for District of Maryland (Silvers, David) [Transferred from Maryland on 12/10/2019.]
November 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melody Dabrowski. Kevin K. McAleenan served on 10/9/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Postal Return Receipt Card)(Silvers, David) [Transferred from Maryland on 12/10/2019.]
November 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melody Dabrowski. Kevin K. McAleenan served on 10/15/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Postal Return Receipt Card)(Silvers, David) [Transferred from Maryland on 12/10/2019.]
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/1/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 12/10/2019.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 60 days as to Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 12/10/2019.]
September 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KEVIN K. MCALEENAN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8262126.), filed by Melody Dabrowski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Silvers, David) [Transferred from Maryland on 12/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DABROWSKI v. MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELODY DABROWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?