PAYPAL, INC. v. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU et al
Plaintiff: PAYPAL, INC.
Defendant: KATHY KRANINGER and CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
Case Number: 1:2019cv03700
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Richard J Leon
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/26/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/24/2020. (Kearney, Daniel)
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/6/2020. (Kearney, Daniel)
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU served on 12/23/2019; KATHY KRANINGER served on 12/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed - Kraninger)(Kearney, Daniel)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/30/2019. (lcrjl3)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, KATHY KRANINGER. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
December 12, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (zmc)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PAYPAL, INC. (Kearney, Daniel)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, KATHY KRANINGER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6637337) filed by PAYPAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - CFPB, #3 Summons - Kraninger)(Kearney, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAYPAL, INC. v. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAYPAL, INC.
Represented By: Daniel P. Kearney
Represented By: Daniel Kearney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHY KRANINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?