DBW PARTNERS, LLC v. BLOOMBERG, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: DBW PARTNERS, LLC and DBW PARTNERS, LLC doing business as CAPITOL FORUM
Defendant: BLOOMBERG, L.P. and BLOOMBERG FINANCE, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03715
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Reggie B Walton
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by DBW PARTNERS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kitton, Fara)
February 4, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to motion to dismiss due by 3/3/2020; Reply in support of motion to dismiss due by 3/27/2020. (hs)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the #13 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that, on or before March 3, 2020, the plaintiff shall respond to the defendants' motion to dismiss. It is further ORDERED that, on or before March 27, 2020, the defendants shall file their reply in support of their motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 4, 2020. (lcrbw3)
February 4, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; emailed to fnkitton@williamslopatto.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. In future, the PACER login credentials and the signature on the pleading must match. (ztth, )
January 30, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by BLOOMBERG FINANCE, L.P., BLOOMBERG, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Tara)
January 28, 2020 Filing 11 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by BLOOMBERG FINANCE, L.P., BLOOMBERG, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Tara); Modified on 1/28/2020 (ztth). Modified on 1/30/2020 (ztth).
January 28, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #11 Motion to Dismiss; emailed to taralee@quinnemanuel.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect header/caption/case number, 2. Please refile document, 3. Docket Entry #11 was entered in error. Incorrect case number on the document. (ztth, )
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the defendants' #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert L. Raskopf, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Robert L. Raskopf, Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP, 51 Madison Avenue, 22nd Floor, New York, New York 10010, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 27, 2019. (lcrbw1)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the defendants' #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jessica A. Rose, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Jessica A. Rose, Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP, 51 Madison Avenue, 22nd Floor, New York, New York 10010, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Reg gie B. Walton on December 27, 2019. (lcrbw1)
December 26, 2019 Filing fee (Pro hac vice) received re #9 : $ 100.00, receipt number: 4616101903. (ztth)
December 26, 2019 Filing fee (Pro hac vice) received re #8 : $ 100.00, receipt number: 4616101902. (ztth)
December 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 1/28/2020, (hs)
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by BLOOMBERG FINANCE, L.P., BLOOMBERG, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Tara)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert L. Raskopf, Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by BLOOMBERG FINANCE, L.P., BLOOMBERG, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Tara) Modified per counsel, not ex parte on 12/19/2019 (ztd).
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jessica A. Rose, Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by BLOOMBERG FINANCE, L.P., BLOOMBERG, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Lee, Tara)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara M. Lee on behalf of All Defendants (Lee, Tara)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendants' #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendants shall file their response to the Complaint on or before January 28, 2020. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 19, 2019. (lcrbw3)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BLOOMBERG FINANCE, L.P. served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020 (Kitton, Fara)
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BLOOMBERG, L.P. served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020 (Kitton, Fara)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to BLOOMBERG FINANCE, L.P., BLOOMBERG, L.P.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
December 13, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zmc)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DBW PARTNERS, LLC (Kitton, Fara)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by DBW PARTNERS, LLC. Case related to Case No. 19-311. (Kitton, Fara)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6641968) filed by DBW PARTNERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Kitton, Fara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DBW PARTNERS, LLC v. BLOOMBERG, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLOOMBERG, L.P.
Represented By: Tara M. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLOOMBERG FINANCE, L.P.
Represented By: Tara M. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DBW PARTNERS, LLC
Represented By: Fara N. Kitton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DBW PARTNERS, LLC doing business as CAPITOL FORUM
Represented By: Fara N. Kitton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?