ADVOCATE BROMENN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER et al v. ALEX M. AZAR II
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE LUTHERAN GENERAL HOSPITAL, AVERA MCKENNAN HOSPITAL & UNIVERSITY HEALTH CENTER, AURORA SHEBOYGAN MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, AMITA HEALTH SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL EVANSTON, ALAMANCE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION VIA CHRISTI HOSPITAL ST. FRANCIS, BAYHEALTH HOSPITAL, KENT CAMPUS, ADVOCATE BROMENN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY HOWARD REGIONAL HEALTH, BECKLEY ARH HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SE WISCONSIN HOSPITAL-ST. JOSEPH CAMPUS, AMITA HEALTH ST. ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER HOFFMAN ESTATES, BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - DEARBORN, ADVOCATE TRINITY HOSPITAL, CLIFTON SPRINGS HOSPITAL AND CLINIC, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH, ASCENSION ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL, COLUMBUS REGIONAL HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST, BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - TAYLOR, ADVOCATE ILLINOIS MASONIC MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION VIA CHRISTI HOSPITAL IN PITTSBURG, D. W. MCMILLAN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ASCENSION ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SETON NORTHWEST, BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - ROYAL OAK, ASCENSION NORTHEAST WISCONSIN SAINT ELIZABETH CAMPUS, ADVOCATE CHRIST MEDICAL CENTER, BAPTIST EASLEY HOSPITAL, BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - FARMINGTON HILLS, BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - GROSSE POINTE, BAYHEALTH HOSPITAL, SUSSEX CAMPUS, ASCENSION COLUMBIA SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL MILWAUKEE, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL ANDERSON, BRONXCARE DR. MARTIN LUTHER KING, JR. HEALTH CENTER, AMITA HEALTH MERCY MEDICAL CENTER AURORA, BETSY JOHNSON REGIONAL HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SACRED HEART HOSPITAL PENSACOLA, BROCKTON HOSPITAL, AURORA SAINT LUKE'S MEDICAL CENTER, CAPE FEAR VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION ALL SAINTS HOSPITAL - SPRING STREET CAMPUS, ASCENSION SAINT JOHN HOSPITAL, AMITA HEALTH SAINTS MARY AND ELIZABETH MEDICAL CENTER SAINT MARY CAMPUS, AURORA WEST ALLIS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CAPE FEAR VALLEY HOKE HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SETON MEDICAL CENTER AUSTIN, AMITA HEALTH ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL KANKAKEE, BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - WAYNE and COOKEVILLE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR II
Case Number: 1:2019cv03751
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 the parties' Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings: It is hereby ORDERED that the proceedings in this case are STAYED until further order from the Court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report within 90 days of issuance of a decision in American Hospital Association v. Azar, Nos. 19-5048, 19-5198 (D.C. Cir.). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/7/2020. (lcrc1)
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by ALEX M. AZAR II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandberg, Justin)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR II served on 12/23/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/26/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/26/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/24/2020.) (MacCarthy, Sara)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
December 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zrdj)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 18cv2084. (MacCarthy, Sara)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ADVOCATE BROMENN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE CHRIST MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE ILLINOIS MASONIC MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE LUTHERAN GENERAL HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE TRINITY HOSPITAL, ALAMANCE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, AMITA HEALTH MERCY MEDICAL CENTER AURORA, AMITA HEALTH SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL EVANSTON, AMITA HEALTH SAINTS MARY AND ELIZABETH MEDICAL CENTER SAINT MARY CAMPUS, AMITA HEALTH ST. ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER HOFFMAN ESTATES, AMITA HEALTH ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL KANKAKEE, ASCENSION ALL SAINTS HOSPITAL - SPRING STREET CAMPUS, ASCENSION COLUMBIA SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL MILWAUKEE, ASCENSION NORTHEAST WISCONSIN SAINT ELIZABETH CAMPUS, ASCENSION SACRED HEART HOSPITAL PENSACOLA, ASCENSION SAINT JOHN HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SE WISCONSIN HOSPITAL-ST. JOSEPH CAMPUS, ASCENSION SETON MEDICAL CENTER AUSTIN, ASCENSION SETON NORTHWEST, ASCENSION ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, ASCENSION ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL, ASCENSION VIA CHRISTI HOSPITAL IN PITTSBURG, ASCENSION VIA CHRISTI HOSPITAL ST. FRANCIS, AURORA SAINT LUKE'S MEDICAL CENTER, AURORA SHEBOYGAN MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, AURORA WEST ALLIS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, AVERA MCKENNAN HOSPITAL & UNIVERSITY HEALTH CENTER, BAPTIST EASLEY HOSPITAL, BAYHEALTH HOSPITAL, KENT CAMPUS, BAYHEALTH HOSPITAL, SUSSEX CAMPUS, BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - DEARBORN, BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - FARMINGTON HILLS, BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - GROSSE POINTE, BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - ROYAL OAK, BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - TAYLOR, BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - WAYNE, BECKLEY ARH HOSPITAL, BETSY JOHNSON REGIONAL HOSPITAL, BROCKTON HOSPITAL, BRONXCARE DR. MARTIN LUTHER KING, JR. HEALTH CENTER, CAPE FEAR VALLEY HOKE HOSPITAL, CAPE FEAR VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, CLIFTON SPRINGS HOSPITAL AND CLINIC, COLUMBUS REGIONAL HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL ANDERSON, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH, COMMUNITY HOWARD REGIONAL HEALTH, COOKEVILLE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, D. W. MCMILLAN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL (MacCarthy, Sara)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6650452) filed by BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - GROSSE POINTE, BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - FARMINGTON HILLS, ASCENSION ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL, AMITA HEALTH MERCY MEDICAL CENTER AURORA, AURORA WEST ALLIS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SE WISCONSIN HOSPITAL-ST. JOSEPH CAMPUS, ADVOCATE CHRIST MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE BROMENN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION SETON MEDICAL CENTER AUSTIN, BAYHEALTH HOSPITAL, SUSSEX CAMPUS, ASCENSION SAINT JOHN HOSPITAL, COLUMBUS REGIONAL HOSPITAL, AVERA MCKENNAN HOSPITAL & UNIVERSITY HEALTH CENTER, AURORA SHEBOYGAN MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAPTIST EASLEY HOSPITAL, BRONXCARE DR. MARTIN LUTHER KING, JR. HEALTH CENTER, ASCENSION ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, ASCENSION NORTHEAST WISCONSIN SAINT ELIZABETH CAMPUS, COOKEVILLE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, AURORA SAINT LUKE'S MEDICAL CENTER, AMITA HEALTH ST. ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER HOFFMAN ESTATES, BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - DEARBORN, BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - TAYLOR, AMITA HEALTH ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL KANKAKEE, COMMUNITY HOWARD REGIONAL HEALTH, CAPE FEAR VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION VIA CHRISTI HOSPITAL IN PITTSBURG, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST, ASCENSION COLUMBIA SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL MILWAUKEE, ASCENSION VIA CHRISTI HOSPITAL ST. FRANCIS, BAYHEALTH HOSPITAL, KENT CAMPUS, ALAMANCE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, D. W. MCMILLAN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BROCKTON HOSPITAL, BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - WAYNE, ADVOCATE ILLINOIS MASONIC MEDICAL CENTER, AMITA HEALTH SAINTS MARY AND ELIZABETH MEDICAL CENTER SAINT MARY CAMPUS, CAPE FEAR VALLEY HOKE HOSPITAL, ASCENSION ALL SAINTS HOSPITAL - SPRING STREET CAMPUS, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH, ASCENSION SACRED HEART HOSPITAL PENSACOLA, BETSY JOHNSON REGIONAL HOSPITAL, AMITA HEALTH SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL EVANSTON, ADVOCATE LUTHERAN GENERAL HOSPITAL, BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - ROYAL OAK, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL ANDERSON, BECKLEY ARH HOSPITAL, CLIFTON SPRINGS HOSPITAL AND CLINIC, ASCENSION SETON NORTHWEST, ADVOCATE TRINITY HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Alex M. Azar II, #3 Summons to U.S. Attorney General, #4 Summons to U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia)(MacCarthy, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADVOCATE BROMENN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER et al v. ALEX M. AZAR II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE LUTHERAN GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AVERA MCKENNAN HOSPITAL & UNIVERSITY HEALTH CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA SHEBOYGAN MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMITA HEALTH SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL EVANSTON
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALAMANCE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION VIA CHRISTI HOSPITAL ST. FRANCIS
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYHEALTH HOSPITAL, KENT CAMPUS
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE BROMENN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY HOWARD REGIONAL HEALTH
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BECKLEY ARH HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION SE WISCONSIN HOSPITAL-ST. JOSEPH CAMPUS
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMITA HEALTH ST. ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER HOFFMAN ESTATES
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - DEARBORN
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE TRINITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLIFTON SPRINGS HOSPITAL AND CLINIC
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBUS REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - TAYLOR
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE ILLINOIS MASONIC MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION VIA CHRISTI HOSPITAL IN PITTSBURG
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. W. MCMILLAN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION SETON NORTHWEST
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - ROYAL OAK
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION NORTHEAST WISCONSIN SAINT ELIZABETH CAMPUS
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE CHRIST MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAPTIST EASLEY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - FARMINGTON HILLS
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - GROSSE POINTE
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYHEALTH HOSPITAL, SUSSEX CAMPUS
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION COLUMBIA SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL MILWAUKEE
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY HOSPITAL ANDERSON
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRONXCARE DR. MARTIN LUTHER KING, JR. HEALTH CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMITA HEALTH MERCY MEDICAL CENTER AURORA
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETSY JOHNSON REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION SACRED HEART HOSPITAL PENSACOLA
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROCKTON HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA SAINT LUKE'S MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAPE FEAR VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION ALL SAINTS HOSPITAL - SPRING STREET CAMPUS
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION SAINT JOHN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMITA HEALTH SAINTS MARY AND ELIZABETH MEDICAL CENTER SAINT MARY CAMPUS
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA WEST ALLIS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAPE FEAR VALLEY HOKE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION SETON MEDICAL CENTER AUSTIN
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMITA HEALTH ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL KANKAKEE
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - WAYNE
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COOKEVILLE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR II
Represented By: Justin Michael Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?