GREENWOOD v. BOLSTER
Plaintiff: TERRENCE O. GREENWOOD
Defendant: MARK J. BOLSTER
Case Number: 1:2019cv03768
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by MARK J. BOLSTER. (Cahill, Timothy)
January 23, 2020 Filing 8 SHOW CAUSE Executed as to United States Attorney pursuant to Order to Show Cause #2 ; Date of Service of show cause order 1/22/20. (ztd)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Ronald Cahill on behalf of MARK J. BOLSTER (Cahill, Timothy)
January 17, 2020 Filing 7 SHOW CAUSE Executed as to MARK J. BOLSTER pursuant to Order to Show Cause #2 ; Date of Service of show cause order 1/16/20. (ztd)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Advising pro se Plaintiff of his obligation to follow the FRCP, Local Rules and orders of the court. Failure to adhere to these rules or orders may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order: The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to TERRENCE O. GREENWOOD, No. 11018-007, PETERSBURG LOW FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, Inmate Mail/Parcels, P.O. BOX 1000, PETERSBURG, VA 23804-1000. (See order for further details) Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/17/2020. (DJS)
January 14, 2020 Filing 4 SHOW CAUSE Executed as to U.S. Attorney General pursuant to Order to Show Cause Date of Service of show cause order 1/14/2020. (eg)
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 SHOW CAUSE (3) Issued as to MARK J. BOLSTER, U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney pursuant to Order to Show Cause #2 (adh, )
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing Respondent to show cause within 20 days of service process why Writ of Habeas should not issue. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/2/20. (ms) Modified on 1/4/2020 (DJS).
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 4616010853.) filed by TERRENCE O. GREENWOOD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-4)(ztd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREENWOOD v. BOLSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK J. BOLSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRENCE O. GREENWOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?