TADICH GRILL OF WASHINGTON DC LLC et al v. WEBSTER
Appellant: ICONCEPTS LLC, ICON INC., LAUREN CENTIOLI and GERARD CENTIOLI
Appellee: MICHAEL BUICH and WENDELL W. WEBSTER
In Re: TADICH GRILL OF WASHINGTON DC LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03779
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Appeals as Moot by MICHAEL BUICH (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Wendell W. Webster, #3 Exhibit 2 - Order Authorizing and Approving Revised Settlement Agreement, #4 Exhibit 3 - Amended Settlement Agreement, #5 Exhibit 4 - Bid Procedures Order, #6 Exhibit 5 - Order Supplementing Oral Decision Approving Settlement, #7 Exhibit 6 - Notice of Consummation of Settlement Agreement, #8 Certificate of Service)(Siegel, Andrew)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that briefing in 19-cv-3779 and 19-cv-3844 is consolidated, and the briefing schedule set forth in the January 24, 2020 Minute Order is hereby VACATED. Parties shall file a single brief addressing the issues raised in both appeals. Pursuant to Rule 8018(a) of the Bankruptcy Rules of Procedure, the following schedule shall apply:Appellants' brief is due on or before March 5, 2020; Appellees' brief is due on or before April 6, 2020; Appellants' reply is due on or before April 20, 2020. The parties are further ORDERED to provide the Court, by April 27, 2020, with a tabbed and bound courtesy copy of a Joint Appendix that contains those portions of the Record cited in the parties' briefing. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 02/04/2020. (lccrc3)
January 28, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #5 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability was entered in error. Incorrect case number on document and Bankruptcy will submit an new record with the correct case number. (ztd)
January 28, 2020 Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal Bankruptcy Court case number 18-00079-SMT.. Related document: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by ICONCEPTS LLC.(zrdj) Modified on 2/3/2020 (ztd).
January 27, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Appellant Brief due by 2/20/2020. Appellant Reply Brief due by 3/23/2020. Replies due by 4/6/2020. Appendix due by 4/13/2020. (lsj)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: As noted in the #3 Notice to Counsel/Party, pursuant to Rule 8018(a) of the Bankruptcy Rules of Procedure, the following schedule shall apply:Appellants' brief is due on or before February 20, 2020;Appellees' brief is due on or before March 23, 2020;Appellants' reply is due on or before April 6, 2020.The parties are hereby ORDERED to provide the Court, by April 13, 2020, with a tabbed and bound courtesy copy of a Joint Appendix that contains those portions of the Record cited in the parties briefing. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 01/24/2020. (lccrc3)
January 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party (ztd) (Main Document 3 replaced on 1/23/2020) (ztd).
January 21, 2020 Filing 4 Amended Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal Bankruptcy Court case number 18-00079-SMT.. Related document: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by ICONCEPTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of 3, #2 Part 3 of 3)(ztd)
January 21, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal Bankruptcy Court case number 18-00079-SMT.. Related document: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by ICONCEPTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of 2)(ztd)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-00079 SMT. File received filed by ICONCEPTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TADICH GRILL OF WASHINGTON DC LLC et al v. WEBSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ICONCEPTS LLC
Represented By: Marc E. Albert
Represented By: Matthew Craig Smilowitz
Represented By: Steven Kent White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ICON INC.
Represented By: Marc E. Albert
Represented By: Matthew Craig Smilowitz
Represented By: Steven Kent White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: LAUREN CENTIOLI
Represented By: Marc E. Albert
Represented By: Matthew Craig Smilowitz
Represented By: Steven Kent White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: GERARD CENTIOLI
Represented By: Marc E. Albert
Represented By: Matthew Craig Smilowitz
Represented By: Steven Kent White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MICHAEL BUICH
Represented By: Michael St. Patrick Baxter
Represented By: Andrew E. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WENDELL W. WEBSTER
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: TADICH GRILL OF WASHINGTON DC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?