DOWNS et al v. RBNR SOLUTIONS, LLP et al
Plaintiff: BETH VIA and ADAM M. DOWNS
Defendant: RBNR MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC, ALI RASSOULPOUR, NAYEREH S. RASSOULPOUR, RBNR SOLUTIONS, LLP, BLENS SOLUTIONS, LLC and ROBIN BREVARD
Case Number: 1:2019cv03782
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Referring Judge: Robin M Meriweather
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Counsel Silvestri's #6 Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel, the undersigned finds that withdrawal will not unduly delay trial of the case, or be unfairly prejudicial to any party, or otherwise not be in the interests of justice. LcvR 83.6(c); see also Later v. District of Columbia, 460 F. Supp. 2d 111, 113 (D.D.C. 2006). Thus, Counsel Silvestri's #6 Motion is hereby GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Counsel Silvestri's appearance on behalf of BLENS Solutions, LLC be struck. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 02/14/2020. (lcnb)
February 12, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE by ADAM M. DOWNS, BETH VIA. BLENS SOLUTIONS, LLC waiver sent on 1/17/2020, answer due 3/17/2020; ROBIN BREVARD waiver sent on 1/17/2020, answer due 3/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ray, James)
February 12, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #7 Waiver of Service, was entered in error per counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (ztd)
February 12, 2020 Filing 7 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .WAIVER OF SERVICE by ADAM M. DOWNS, BETH VIA. BLENS SOLUTIONS, LLC waiver sent on 1/17/2020, answer due 3/17/2020; ROBIN BREVARD waiver sent on 1/17/2020, answer due 3/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ray, James) Modified on 2/12/2020 (ztd).
February 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for BLENS Solutions LLC by ALI RASSOULPOUR, NAYEREH S. RASSOULPOUR, RBNR MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC, RBNR SOLUTIONS, LLP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silvestri, Stephen)
February 3, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM re #4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, Cover Sheet,, Request for Summons to Issue, filed by ALI RASSOULPOUR, RBNR MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC, RBNR SOLUTIONS, LLP, NAYEREH S. RASSOULPOUR, ROBIN BREVARD, BLENS SOLUTIONS, LLC by ALI RASSOULPOUR, NAYEREH S. RASSOULPOUR, RBNR MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC, RBNR SOLUTIONS, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1, #2 Affidavit Exhibit 2)(Silvestri, Stephen)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendants' #4 Motion for Extension of Time. As Defendants note, their motion is governed by Rule 6(b)(1)(B), which permits an extension "if the party failed to act because of excusable neglect." Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b)(1)(B); Smith v. District of Columbia, 430 F.3d 450, 456-57 (D.C. Cir. 2005). Defendants assert their failure to file a timely answer was "because of excusable neglect," but fail to provide sufficient details for the Court to ascertain whether that is the case. For example, Defendants do not explain whether they were aware of the deadline before it expired, whether their lack of retained counsel prevented them from timely seeking an extension or filing an answer, or whether they timely sought to retain counsel. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file a supplemental memorandum in support of their motion, addressing why their failure to timely file an Answer is attributable to excusable neglect; and that such supplemental memorandum shall be due by February 3, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 1/27/2020. (lcnb)
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, Cover Sheet,, Request for Summons to Issue, by BLENS SOLUTIONS, LLC, ROBIN BREVARD, ALI RASSOULPOUR, NAYEREH S. RASSOULPOUR, RBNR MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC, RBNR SOLUTIONS, LLP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silvestri, Stephen)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALI RASSOULPOUR served on 12/26/2019, answer due 1/16/2020; NAYEREH S. RASSOULPOUR served on 12/26/2019, answer due 1/16/2020; RBNR MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC served on 12/26/2019, answer due 1/16/2020; RBNR SOLUTIONS, LLP served on 12/26/2019, answer due 1/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Ali Rassoulpour, #2 Affidavit for Nayereh Rassoulpou, #3 Affidavit for RBNR Solutions, LLP, #4 Affidavit for RBNR Management Group, LLC, #5 Certificate of Service)(Ray, James)
December 20, 2019 CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather for full case management. (zad)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court has determined that this action should be referred to a Magistrate Judge for full case management, up to and including issuance of a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive motions, but excluding trial. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this matter is referred to a Magistrate Judge, beginning immediately; the Magistrate Judge will be randomly assigned by the Clerk's Office; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that any future filings related to this matter shall have the initials of the presiding judge and the magistrate judge following the case number in the caption. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/20/19. (DJS)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to BLENS SOLUTIONS, LLC, ROBIN BREVARD, ALI RASSOULPOUR, NAYEREH S. RASSOULPOUR, RBNR MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC, RBNR SOLUTIONS, LLP. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
December 20, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (adh, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6663900), CIVIL COVER SHEET by ADAM M. DOWNS, BETH VIA, REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by ADAM M. DOWNS, BETH VIA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ray, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOWNS et al v. RBNR SOLUTIONS, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBNR MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Stephen M. Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALI RASSOULPOUR
Represented By: Stephen M. Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAYEREH S. RASSOULPOUR
Represented By: Stephen M. Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBNR SOLUTIONS, LLP
Represented By: Stephen M. Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLENS SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By: Stephen M. Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBIN BREVARD
Represented By: Stephen M. Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETH VIA
Represented By: James S. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM M. DOWNS
Represented By: James S. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?