BANNER UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER PHOENIX et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, UH CLEVELAND MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER PHOENIX, BANNER UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER TUCSON, HOSPITAL FOR SPECIAL SURGERY and BANNER UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER SOUTH
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv03788
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/30/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/30/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/28/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 1/2/2020 (Connelly, Ronald)
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BANNER UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER PHOENIX, BANNER UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER SOUTH, BANNER UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER TUCSON, HOSPITAL FOR SPECIAL SURGERY, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, UH CLEVELAND MEDICAL CENTER re #4 Amended Complaint, on all Defendants. (Connelly, Ronald)
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II filed by UH CLEVELAND MEDICAL CENTER, HOSPITAL FOR SPECIAL SURGERY, BANNER UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER PHOENIX, BANNER UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER TUCSON, BANNER UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER SOUTH, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER.(Connelly, Ronald)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
December 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (adh, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BANNER UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER PHOENIX, BANNER UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER SOUTH, BANNER UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER TUCSON, HOSPITAL FOR SPECIAL SURGERY, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, UH CLEVELAND MEDICAL CENTER (Connelly, Ronald)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6666662) filed by UH CLEVELAND MEDICAL CENTER, HOSPITAL FOR SPECIAL SURGERY, BANNER UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER PHOENIX, BANNER UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER TUCSON, BANNER UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER SOUTH, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons US Attorney General, #3 Summons Sec. of HHS, #4 Summons US Attorney)(Connelly, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BANNER UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER PHOENIX et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Ronald S. Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UH CLEVELAND MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Ronald S. Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANNER UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER PHOENIX
Represented By: Ronald S. Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANNER UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER TUCSON
Represented By: Ronald S. Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOSPITAL FOR SPECIAL SURGERY
Represented By: Ronald S. Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANNER UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER SOUTH
Represented By: Ronald S. Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?