608 GIRARD STREET, LLC v. CAPITAL BANK, N.A.
Plaintiff: 608 GIRARD STREET, LLC
Defendant: CAPITAL BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03800
Filed: December 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #5 MOTION to Dismiss (Opposition to Motion to Dismiss) filed by 608 GIRARD STREET, LLC. (Palik, Craig)
January 17, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to dispositive motion due by 1/21/2020. (tb)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss due January 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/15/20. (DJS)
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by 608 GIRARD STREET, LLC (Palik, Craig)
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss by 608 GIRARD STREET, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palik, Craig)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by CAPITAL BANK, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Order granting relief from automatic stay, #3 Exhibit Order dismissing bankruptcy case 608 Girard Street, #4 Exhibit Order dismissing bankruptcy case Guadie Developments, #5 Exhibit Title Memorandum filed in the bankruptcies, #6 Exhibit Nov 23, 2014 Deed of Trust, #7 Exhibit Jan 23, 2015 Deed of Trust, #8 Exhibit Equity Trust Deed if Trust #1, #9 Exhibit Equity Trust Deed of Trust #2, #10 Exhibit Ganges Financial Deed of Trust, #11 Exhibit Equity Trust Deed of Trust Modification, #12 Exhibit June 29, 2016 Deed of Trust, #13 Exhibit Church Street Capital Deed of Trust, #14 Exhibit Hali Capital Option #1, #15 Exhibit Hali Capital Option #2, #16 Exhibit Tucker Family Deed of Trust, #17 Exhibit June 29, 2016 Note, #18 Exhibit Note modification, #19 Exhibit Proof of Claim worksheet, #20 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Lawrence)
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal (zsb)
December 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb)
December 21, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CAPITAL BANK, N.A. (Anderson, Lawrence)
December 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by CAPITAL BANK, N.A. (Anderson, Lawrence)
December 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 19-0007683 Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADCDC-6669132 filed by CAPITAL BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Attachments, #2 Exhibit Verified Complaint with attachments, #3 Exhibit Motion for TRO with attachments, #4 Exhibit Notice of Hearing on TRO motion, #5 Exhibit Summons and Initial Order, #6 Exhibit Order denying TRO, #7 Exhibit Consent Motion to Extend Time, #8 Exhibit Proposed Order on Consent Motion, #9 Exhibit Amended Consent Motion to Extend Time, #10 Exhibit Order Granting Motion to Extend Time, #11 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Anderson, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 608 GIRARD STREET, LLC v. CAPITAL BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Lawrence John Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 608 GIRARD STREET, LLC
Represented By: Craig Michael Palik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?