JACKSON v. SAUL
Plaintiff: ALVONICIA JACKSON
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Case Number: 1:2019cv03803
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/5/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/5/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/5/2020.) (eg)
February 4, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to ANDREW M. SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zsb)
January 29, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zmc)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIAT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED." Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/28/2020. (zmc)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ALVONICIA JACKSON. (zmd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL filed by ALVONICIA JACKSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (zmd)
December 20, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 12/20/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACKSON v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALVONICIA JACKSON
Represented By: Stephen F. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?