OLSEN v. AZAR
Plaintiff: JEREMY OLSEN
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv03814
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Reggie B Walton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to opposition to motion re #2 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JEREMY OLSEN. (Blumenfeld, Jeffrey)
February 18, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/23/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/23/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/17/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 1/17/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service)(Blumenfeld, Jeffrey)
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 Memorandum in opposition to re #2 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Order in Zieroth v. Azar)(Bickford, James)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file his opposition to the plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on or before February 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 6, 2020. (lcrbw3)
February 6, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/10/2020. (hs)
February 5, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bickford, James)
February 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James O. Bickford on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Bickford, James)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the plaintiff's #5 Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that James C. Pistorino, 224 Lexington Drive, Menlo Park, CA 94025, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 29, 2020. (lcrbw3)
January 24, 2020 Filing fee received Motion for Pro Hac Vice #5 : $ 100.00, receipt number: 4616102182. (ztd)
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- James C. Pistorino, Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by JEREMY OLSEN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Blumenfeld, Jeffrey)
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 ERRATA Notice of Errata Regarding Complaint by JEREMY OLSEN #1 Complaint, filed by JEREMY OLSEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Corrected Complaint)(Blumenfeld, Jeffrey)
December 26, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (adh, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Summary Judgment by JEREMY OLSEN (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Blumenfeld, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld, Jeffrey)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6672310) filed by JEREMY OLSEN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (US Dept. of HHS), #3 Summons (USAG), #4 Summons (USAO), #5 Notice of Related Case)(Blumenfeld, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OLSEN v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY OLSEN
Represented By: Jeffrey Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?