CABRERA et al v. BLACK & VEATCH SPECIAL PROJECTS CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: VIRGINIA NEWSOM, BRAD JOSEPH HALLIDAY, ANGELA FRITZGES, LONDON JACINDA BELL, ANDREA ROE, BRENDA GRINER, S. B., A MINOR, GILLIAN LEIGH CABRERA, FREDERICK C. BENSON, APRIL ANGEL BAYS, AUGUST CABRERA, BOBBY GENE ANDERSON, R. X. C., A MINOR, JOHN DAVID ANDERSON, BEVERLY MILLS, M. G. C., A MINOR, GINNY LAMB, LUCAS GONZALES, JD PROSSER, CAITLIN ELIZABETH ANDERSON, CHERYL ATWELL, ERIN RIEDEL, CORBIN CABRERA, KYLE BALDUF, L. G. A., A MINOR, ROBERT CABRERA, JAMES BOUCHER, SR., JAMES BELL, MARGARET ANDERSON, CHRISTOPHER BALDRIDGE, LINDSAY REDOUTEY, JESSIE BALDRIDGE, JAMES MICHAEL BOUCHER, JR., APRIL LYNN ANDERSON, EDUARDO OCHOA, BRETT BARRETT, SHERRY LOAN, PAUL MURPHY, ROSA IRMA HALLIDAY, PATRICIA MARLENE GOODWIN, LINDA PHANEUF, SUZANNE RENAE MARTINEZ, TIMOTHY LEE BAYS, ARMANDO OCHOA, L. B., A MINOR, E. B., A MINOR, BETHANY ANN BENTON, ALMA MURPHY, BOBBY JOE ANDERSON, PAMELA E. ALEXANDER BELL, L.B., M.G.C., L.G.A, S.B., E.B., R.X.C. and MICHAEL DAVITT
Defendant: MTN GROUP LIMITED, LOUIS BERGER INTERNATIONAL, INC., LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC. / BLACK & VEATCH SPECIAL PROJECTS CORPORATION JOINT VENTURE, ENVIRONMENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, BLACK & VEATCH SPECIAL PROJECTS CORPORATION, DAI GLOBAL LLC, G4S HOLDINGS INTERNATIONAL (AG) LIMITED, LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC., MTN (DUBAI) LIMITED, MTN AFGHANISTAN, G4S RISK MANAGEMENT LIMITED, JANUS GLOBAL OPERATIONS LLC and CENTERRA GROUP, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03833
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 18:2331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Michael Davitt . This has no effect on the claims asserted by the other Plaintiffs. (Branson, Joshua)
February 13, 2020 Filing 56 WAIVER OF SERVICE by BOBBY JOE ANDERSON, APRIL LYNN ANDERSON, JD PROSSER, JAMES BOUCHER, SR, SHERRY LOAN, CORBIN CABRERA, GILLIAN LEIGH CABRERA, BOBBY GENE ANDERSON, R.X.C., L.B., JAMES BELL, LINDA PHANEUF, GINNY LAMB, CAITLIN ELIZABETH ANDERSON, CHERYL ATWELL, LONDON JACINDA BELL, BETHANY ANN BENTON, SUZANNE RENAE MARTINEZ, AUGUST CABRERA, FREDERICK C. BENSON, BRETT BARRETT, PAUL MURPHY, PATRICIA MARLENE GOODWIN, MARGARET ANDERSON, LINDSAY REDOUTEY, KYLE BALDUF, ALMA MURPHY, CHRISTOPHER BALDRIDGE, JESSIE BALDRIDGE, LUCAS GONZALES, L.G.A, APRIL ANGEL BAYS, BRAD JOSEPH HALLIDAY, ROSA IRMA HALLIDAY, TIMOTHY LEE BAYS, ANDREA ROE, ERIN RIEDEL, VIRGINIA NEWSOM, M.G.C., EDUARDO OCHOA, BRENDA GRINER, BEVERLY MILLS, JOHN DAVID ANDERSON, PAMELA E. ALEXANDER BELL, S.B., ARMANDO OCHOA, ROBERT CABRERA, E.B., JAMES MICHAEL BOUCHER, JR, ANGELA FRITZGES. G4S HOLDINGS INTERNATIONAL (AG) LIMITED waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 4/29/2020; G4S RISK MANAGEMENT LIMITED waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 4/29/2020. (Branson, Joshua)
February 12, 2020 Filing 55 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by PAMELA E. ALEXANDER BELL, APRIL LYNN ANDERSON, BOBBY JOE ANDERSON, BOBBY GENE ANDERSON, CAITLIN ELIZABETH ANDERSON, JOHN DAVID ANDERSON, MARGARET ANDERSON, CHERYL ATWELL, CHRISTOPHER BALDRIDGE, JESSIE BALDRIDGE, KYLE BALDUF, BRETT BARRETT, APRIL ANGEL BAYS, TIMOTHY LEE BAYS, JAMES BELL, LONDON JACINDA BELL, FREDERICK C. BENSON, BETHANY ANN BENTON, JAMES BOUCHER, SR, JAMES MICHAEL BOUCHER, JR, AUGUST CABRERA, CORBIN CABRERA, GILLIAN LEIGH CABRERA, ROBERT CABRERA, E.B., ANGELA FRITZGES, LUCAS GONZALES, PATRICIA MARLENE GOODWIN, BRENDA GRINER, BRAD JOSEPH HALLIDAY, ROSA IRMA HALLIDAY, L.B., L.G.A, GINNY LAMB, SHERRY LOAN, M.G.C., SUZANNE RENAE MARTINEZ, BEVERLY MILLS, ALMA MURPHY, PAUL MURPHY, VIRGINIA NEWSOM, ARMANDO OCHOA, EDUARDO OCHOA, LINDA PHANEUF, JD PROSSER, R.X.C., LINDSAY REDOUTEY, ERIN RIEDEL, ANDREA ROE, S.B.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Branson, Joshua)
February 11, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan R. Sparacino on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sparacino, Ryan)
February 10, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Anthony Dante on behalf of LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC., LOUIS BERGER INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Dante, Frank)
February 7, 2020 Filing 52 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTERRA GROUP, LLC (Lee, Tara)
February 7, 2020 Filing 51 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BLACK & VEATCH SPECIAL PROJECTS CORPORATION served on 1/8/2020, answer due 1/29/2020; CENTERRA GROUP, LLC served on 1/8/2020, answer due 1/29/2020; DAI GLOBAL LLC served on 1/8/2020, answer due 1/29/2020; ENVIRONMENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020; JANUS GLOBAL OPERATIONS LLC served on 1/8/2020, answer due 1/29/2020; LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC. served on 1/7/2020, answer due 1/28/2020; LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC. / BLACK & VEATCH SPECIAL PROJECTS CORPORATION JOINT VENTURE served on 1/7/2020, answer due 1/28/2020; LOUIS BERGER INTERNATIONAL, INC. served on 1/7/2020, answer due 1/28/2020 (Branson, Joshua)
February 7, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants G4S Holdings International (AG) Limited And G4S Risk Management Limited Answer Or Otherwise Response To The Complaint due by 4/29/2020. (mac)
February 7, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Centerra Group, LLC To Comply With Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule Civil Rule 26.1 due by 2/13/2020. (mac)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #49 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Frank A. Dante is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/6/2020. (lcegs3)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Defendant Centerra Group, LLC shall comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Civil Rule 26.1 by no later than February 13, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/6/2020. (lcegs3)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER construing #44 Stipulation Joint Motion Regarding G4S Defendants' Waiver of Service & Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint as a motion, and granting the motion. Defendants G4S Holdings International (AG) Limited and G4S Risk Management Limited shall file the Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by no later than April 29, 2020. The parties shall comply with this Court's Standing Order for all future filings. See Standing Order, ECF No. #7 at 8 ("Extensions or enlargements of time will only be granted upon motion, and not upon stipulation by the parties."). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/6/2020. (lcegs3)
February 6, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Lankler on behalf of BLACK & VEATCH SPECIAL PROJECTS CORPORATION (Lankler, Andrew)
February 5, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Frank A. Dante, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6801018. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC., LOUIS BERGER INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Frank A Dante, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Nadler, David)
February 4, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan Quigley on behalf of BLACK & VEATCH SPECIAL PROJECTS CORPORATION (Quigley, Brendan)
January 31, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Russell on behalf of LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC., LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC. / BLACK & VEATCH SPECIAL PROJECTS CORPORATION JOINT VENTURE, LOUIS BERGER INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Russell, Alexandra)
January 30, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil Harvey MacBride on behalf of JANUS GLOBAL OPERATIONS LLC (MacBride, Neil)
January 30, 2020 Filing 45 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by G4S HOLDINGS INTERNATIONAL (AG) LIMITED, G4S RISK MANAGEMENT LIMITED (Sweet, Mark)
January 30, 2020 Filing 44 STIPULATION Joint MOTION regarding G4S Defendants' Waiver of Service & Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by G4S HOLDINGS INTERNATIONAL (AG) LIMITED, G4S RISK MANAGEMENT LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sweet, Mark)
January 30, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Andrew Bromberg on behalf of G4S HOLDINGS INTERNATIONAL (AG) LIMITED, G4S RISK MANAGEMENT LIMITED (Bromberg, Todd)
January 30, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Obermeier on behalf of G4S HOLDINGS INTERNATIONAL (AG) LIMITED, G4S RISK MANAGEMENT LIMITED (Obermeier, Stephen)
January 30, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Bradley Sweet on behalf of G4S HOLDINGS INTERNATIONAL (AG) LIMITED, G4S RISK MANAGEMENT LIMITED (Sweet, Mark)
January 30, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Answer Or Otherwise Response To The Complaint due by 4/29/2020. (mac)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #36 Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time. Defendant shall filed an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by no later than April 29, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 01/29/2020. (lcegs2)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #38 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Brendan F. Quigley is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 01/29/2020. (lcegs2)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #37 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Andrew M. Lankler is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 01/29/2020. (lcegs2)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Hariklia Karis is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 01/29/2020. (lcegs2)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jeffrey L. Willian is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 01/29/2020. (lcegs2)
January 29, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall Wade Jackson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Randall)
January 29, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Gottlieb on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gottlieb, Michael)
January 28, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brendan F. Quigley, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6775089. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BLACK & VEATCH SPECIAL PROJECTS CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brendan F. Quigley, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jeffress, William)
January 28, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Andrew M. Lankler, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6775080. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BLACK & VEATCH SPECIAL PROJECTS CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew M. Lankler, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jeffress, William)
January 28, 2020 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,, by LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC. / BLACK & VEATCH SPECIAL PROJECTS CORPORATION JOINT VENTURE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassin, Vern)
January 28, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Vern Cassin on behalf of LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC. / BLACK & VEATCH SPECIAL PROJECTS CORPORATION JOINT VENTURE (Cassin, Vern)
January 28, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Winn Allen on behalf of LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC. / BLACK & VEATCH SPECIAL PROJECTS CORPORATION JOINT VENTURE (Allen, Kenneth)
January 28, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Hariklia Karis, P.C., Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6774742. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC., LOUIS BERGER INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hariklia Karis, P.C., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Allen, Kenneth)
January 28, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jeffrey L. Willian, P.C., Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6774729. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC., LOUIS BERGER INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey L. Willian, P.C., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Allen, Kenneth)
January 28, 2020 Filing 31 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BLACK & VEATCH SPECIAL PROJECTS CORPORATION (Jeffress, William)
January 28, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew T. George on behalf of BLACK & VEATCH SPECIAL PROJECTS CORPORATION (George, Andrew)
January 28, 2020 Filing 29 Request For International Assistance (Letter Of Request) Filed By Plaintiffs And Signed By Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/27/20 (mac)
January 28, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Answer Or Otherwise Response To The Complaint due by 4/29/2020. (mac)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #25 Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time. Defendant shall filed an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by no later than April 29, 2020.. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 01/27/2020. (lcegs2)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Alexandra I. Russell is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 01/27/2020. (lcegs2)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Adam G. Mehes is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 01/27/2020. (lcegs2)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Paul S. Mishkin is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 01/27/2020. (lcegs2)
January 27, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Nadler on behalf of LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC., LOUIS BERGER INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Nadler, David)
January 24, 2020 Filing 27 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ENVIRONMENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION (Berger, Mitchell)
January 24, 2020 Filing 26 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC., LOUIS BERGER INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Allen, Kenneth)
January 24, 2020 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by BLACK & VEATCH SPECIAL PROJECTS CORPORATION, CENTERRA GROUP, LLC, DAI GLOBAL LLC, ENVIRONMENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, JANUS GLOBAL OPERATIONS LLC, LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC., LOUIS BERGER INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Manning, Christopher)
January 24, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Alexandra I. Russell, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6765240. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC., LOUIS BERGER INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandra I. Russell, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Allen, Kenneth)
January 24, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Winn Allen on behalf of LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC., LOUIS BERGER INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Allen, Kenneth)
January 24, 2020 Filing 22 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JANUS GLOBAL OPERATIONS LLC (Wainstein, Kenneth)
January 24, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Adam G. Mehes, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6765104. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JANUS GLOBAL OPERATIONS LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam G. Mehes, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wainstein, Kenneth)
January 24, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Paul S. Mishkin, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6765058. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JANUS GLOBAL OPERATIONS LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul S. Mishkin, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wainstein, Kenneth)
January 24, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra E. Chopin on behalf of ENVIRONMENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION (Chopin, Alexandra)
January 24, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Leonard Wainstein on behalf of JANUS GLOBAL OPERATIONS LLC (Wainstein, Kenneth)
January 24, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell R. Berger on behalf of ENVIRONMENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION (Berger, Mitchell)
January 24, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory Regarding MTN Group Limited by PAMELA E. ALEXANDER BELL, APRIL LYNN ANDERSON, BOBBY JOE ANDERSON, BOBBY GENE ANDERSON, CAITLIN ELIZABETH ANDERSON, JOHN DAVID ANDERSON, MARGARET ANDERSON, CHERYL ATWELL, CHRISTOPHER BALDRIDGE, JESSIE BALDRIDGE, KYLE BALDUF, BRETT BARRETT, APRIL ANGEL BAYS, TIMOTHY LEE BAYS, JAMES BELL, LONDON JACINDA BELL, FREDERICK C. BENSON, BETHANY ANN BENTON, JAMES BOUCHER, SR, JAMES MICHAEL BOUCHER, JR, AUGUST CABRERA, CORBIN CABRERA, GILLIAN LEIGH CABRERA, ROBERT CABRERA, E.B., ANGELA FRITZGES, LUCAS GONZALES, PATRICIA MARLENE GOODWIN, BRENDA GRINER, BRAD JOSEPH HALLIDAY, ROSA IRMA HALLIDAY, L.B., L.G.A, GINNY LAMB, SHERRY LOAN, M.G.C., SUZANNE RENAE MARTINEZ, BEVERLY MILLS, ALMA MURPHY, PAUL MURPHY, VIRGINIA NEWSOM, ARMANDO OCHOA, EDUARDO OCHOA, LINDA PHANEUF, JD PROSSER, R.X.C., LINDSAY REDOUTEY, ERIN RIEDEL, ANDREA ROE, S.B. (Attachments: #1 Request for International Judicial Assistance (Letters Rogatory) for Service of Process Upon MTN Group Limited, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons to MTN Group Limited, #4 Judge Sullivan Standing Order)(Branson, Joshua)
January 24, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Vern Cassin on behalf of BLACK & VEATCH SPECIAL PROJECTS CORPORATION (Cassin, Vern)
January 24, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Jeffress, Jr on behalf of BLACK & VEATCH SPECIAL PROJECTS CORPORATION (Jeffress, William)
January 24, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan Ann McCaffrey on behalf of CENTERRA GROUP, LLC (McCaffrey, Meghan)
January 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara M. Lee on behalf of CENTERRA GROUP, LLC (Lee, Tara)
January 24, 2020 Filing 11 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DAI GLOBAL LLC (Manning, Christopher)
January 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Nicholas Manning on behalf of DAI GLOBAL LLC (Manning, Christopher)
January 16, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS (1) Reissued Electronically as to MTN GROUP LIMITED. (ztth)
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Amending Address for MTN Group Limited filed by BOBBY JOE ANDERSON, APRIL LYNN ANDERSON, JD PROSSER, JAMES BOUCHER, SR, SHERRY LOAN, CORBIN CABRERA, GILLIAN LEIGH CABRERA, BOBBY GENE ANDERSON, R.X.C., L.B., JAMES BELL, LINDA PHANEUF, GINNY LAMB, CAITLIN ELIZABETH ANDERSON, CHERYL ATWELL, LONDON JACINDA BELL, BETHANY ANN BENTON, SUZANNE RENAE MARTINEZ, AUGUST CABRERA, FREDERICK C. BENSON, BRETT BARRETT, PAUL MURPHY, PATRICIA MARLENE GOODWIN, MARGARET ANDERSON, LINDSAY REDOUTEY, KYLE BALDUF, ALMA MURPHY, CHRISTOPHER BALDRIDGE, JESSIE BALDRIDGE, LUCAS GONZALES, L.G.A, APRIL ANGEL BAYS, BRAD JOSEPH HALLIDAY, ROSA IRMA HALLIDAY, TIMOTHY LEE BAYS, ANDREA ROE, ERIN RIEDEL, VIRGINIA NEWSOM, M.G.C., EDUARDO OCHOA, BRENDA GRINER, BEVERLY MILLS, JOHN DAVID ANDERSON, PAMELA E. ALEXANDER BELL, S.B., ARMANDO OCHOA, ROBERT CABRERA, E.B., JAMES MICHAEL BOUCHER, JR, ANGELA FRITZGES.(Branson, Joshua)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 01/06/20. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin A. Hoffman on behalf of DANA MARIE BERNHARDT, MARY LEE WISE, MARY HEATHER WISE, E.P., MINDYLOU PARESI, ELIZABETH SANTINA PARESI, JANET PARESI, SANTINA CARTISSER, TERRY PARESI, ALEXANDRA VANDENBROEK (Hoffman, Kevin)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (13) Issued Electronically as to BLACK & VEATCH SPECIAL PROJECTS CORPORATION, CENTERRA GROUP, LLC, DAI GLOBAL LLC, ENVIRONMENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, G4S HOLDINGS INTERNATIONAL (AG) LIMITED, G4S RISK MANAGEMENT LIMITED, JANUS GLOBAL OPERATIONS LLC, LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC., LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC. / BLACK & VEATCH SPECIAL PROJECTS CORPORATION JOINT VENTURE, LOUIS BERGER INTERNATIONAL, INC., MTN (DUBAI) LIMITED, MTN AFGHANISTAN, MTN GROUP LIMITED. (adh, )
December 30, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (adh, )
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION for Waiver of Local Civil Rule 5.1(c) by L. G. A., A MINOR, PAMELA E. ALEXANDER BELL, APRIL LYNN ANDERSON, BOBBY JOE ANDERSON, BOBBY GENE ANDERSON, CAITLIN ELIZABETH ANDERSON, JOHN DAVID ANDERSON, MARGARET ANDERSON, CHERYL ATWELL, E. B., A MINOR, L. B., A MINOR, S. B., A MINOR, CHRISTOPHER BALDRIDGE, JESSIE BALDRIDGE, KYLE BALDUF, BRETT BARRETT, APRIL ANGEL BAYS, TIMOTHY LEE BAYS, JAMES BELL, LONDON JACINDA BELL, FREDERICK C. BENSON, BETHANY ANN BENTON, JAMES BOUCHER, SR, JAMES MICHAEL BOUCHER, JR, M. G. C., A MINOR, R. X. C., A MINOR, AUGUST CABRERA, CORBIN CABRERA, GILLIAN LEIGH CABRERA, ROBERT CABRERA, ANGELA FRITZGES, LUCAS GONZALES, PATRICIA MARLENE GOODWIN, BRENDA GRINER, BRAD JOSEPH HALLIDAY, ROSA IRMA HALLIDAY, GINNY LAMB, SHERRY LOAN, SUZANNE RENAE MARTINEZ, BEVERLY MILLS, ALMA MURPHY, PAUL MURPHY, VIRGINIA NEWSOM, ARMANDO OCHOA, EDUARDO OCHOA, LINDA PHANEUF, JD PROSSER, LINDSAY REDOUTEY, ERIN RIEDEL, ANDREA ROE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Branson, Joshua)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Grace W. Knofczynski on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Knofczynski, Grace)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Edward Goldsmith on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Goldsmith, Andrew)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE ANTI-TERRORISM ACT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BDCDC-6682210) filed by BOBBY JOE ANDERSON, APRIL LYNN ANDERSON, JD PROSSER, JAMES BOUCHER, SR, SHERRY LOAN, CORBIN CABRERA, GILLIAN LEIGH CABRERA, BOBBY GENE ANDERSON, R. X. C., A MINOR, L. B., A MINOR, JAMES BELL, LINDA PHANEUF, GINNY LAMB, CAITLIN ELIZABETH ANDERSON, LONDON JACINDA BELL, CHERYL ATWELL, BETHANY ANN BENTON, SUZANNE RENAE MARTINEZ, AUGUST CABRERA, FREDERICK C. BENSON, BRETT BARRETT, PAUL MURPHY, PATRICIA MARLENE GOODWIN, MARGARET ANDERSON, LINDSAY REDOUTEY, KYLE BALDUF, ALMA MURPHY, CHRISTOPHER BALDRIDGE, JESSIE BALDRIDGE, LUCAS GONZALES, L. G. A., A MINOR, APRIL ANGEL BAYS, BRAD JOSEPH HALLIDAY, ROSA IRMA HALLIDAY, TIMOTHY LEE BAYS, ANDREA ROE, ERIN RIEDEL, VIRGINIA NEWSOM, M. G. C., A MINOR, EDUARDO OCHOA, BRENDA GRINER, BEVERLY MILLS, JOHN DAVID ANDERSON, PAMELA E. ALEXANDER BELL, ARMANDO OCHOA, S. B., A MINOR, E. B., A MINOR, ROBERT CABRERA, JAMES MICHAEL BOUCHER, JR, ANGELA FRITZGES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Black & Veatch Special Projects Corporation, #3 Summons to Centerra Group, LLC, #4 Summons to DAI Global LLC, #5 Summons to Environmental Chemical Corporation, #6 Summons to G4S Holdings International (AG) Limited, #7 Summons to G4S Risk Management Limited, #8 Summons to Janus Global Operations LLC, #9 Summons to Louis Berger Group, Inc. / Black & Veatch Special Projects Corporation Joint Venture, #10 Summons to Louis Berger Group, Inc., #11 Summons to Louis Berger International, Inc., #12 Summons to MTN Afghanistan, #13 Summons to MTN (Dubai) Limited, #14 Summons to MTN Group Limited)(Branson, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CABRERA et al v. BLACK & VEATCH SPECIAL PROJECTS CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIRGINIA NEWSOM
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRAD JOSEPH HALLIDAY
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA FRITZGES
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LONDON JACINDA BELL
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREA ROE
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA GRINER
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. B., A MINOR
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GILLIAN LEIGH CABRERA
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREDERICK C. BENSON
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APRIL ANGEL BAYS
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUGUST CABRERA
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOBBY GENE ANDERSON
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. X. C., A MINOR
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DAVID ANDERSON
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEVERLY MILLS
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. G. C., A MINOR
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GINNY LAMB
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUCAS GONZALES
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JD PROSSER
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAITLIN ELIZABETH ANDERSON
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERYL ATWELL
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIN RIEDEL
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORBIN CABRERA
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KYLE BALDUF
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. G. A., A MINOR
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT CABRERA
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES BOUCHER, SR.
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES BELL
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGARET ANDERSON
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER BALDRIDGE
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDSAY REDOUTEY
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSIE BALDRIDGE
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MICHAEL BOUCHER, JR.
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APRIL LYNN ANDERSON
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDUARDO OCHOA
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRETT BARRETT
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERRY LOAN
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL MURPHY
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSA IRMA HALLIDAY
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA MARLENE GOODWIN
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA PHANEUF
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUZANNE RENAE MARTINEZ
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY LEE BAYS
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARMANDO OCHOA
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. B., A MINOR
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. B., A MINOR
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETHANY ANN BENTON
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALMA MURPHY
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOBBY JOE ANDERSON
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMELA E. ALEXANDER BELL
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.B.
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.G.C.
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.G.A
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.B.
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.B.
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.X.C.
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Randall Wade Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL DAVITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTN GROUP LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUIS BERGER INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Frank Anthony Dante
Represented By: Alexandra Russell
Represented By: Kenneth Winn Allen
Represented By: David M. Nadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC. / BLACK & VEATCH SPECIAL PROJECTS CORPORATION JOINT VENTURE
Represented By: Vern Cassin
Represented By: Alexandra Russell
Represented By: Kenneth Winn Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENVIRONMENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Mitchell R. Berger
Represented By: Alexandra E. Chopin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLACK & VEATCH SPECIAL PROJECTS CORPORATION
Represented By: William H. Jeffress, Jr.
Represented By: Vern Cassin
Represented By: Andrew T. George
Represented By: Andrew M. Lankler
Represented By: Brendan Quigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAI GLOBAL LLC
Represented By: Christopher Nicholas Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G4S HOLDINGS INTERNATIONAL (AG) LIMITED
Represented By: Todd Andrew Bromberg
Represented By: Mark Bradley Sweet
Represented By: Stephen J. Obermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Frank Anthony Dante
Represented By: Alexandra Russell
Represented By: Kenneth Winn Allen
Represented By: David M. Nadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTN (DUBAI) LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTN AFGHANISTAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G4S RISK MANAGEMENT LIMITED
Represented By: Todd Andrew Bromberg
Represented By: Mark Bradley Sweet
Represented By: Stephen J. Obermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANUS GLOBAL OPERATIONS LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Leonard Wainstein
Represented By: Neil Harvey MacBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTERRA GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Meghan Ann McCaffrey
Represented By: Tara M. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?