In Re SUBPOENA SERVED ON STEPHEN K. BANNON et al v. BANNON
Petitioner: STRATEGIC VISION US LLC
Respondent: STEPHEN K. BANNON
In Re: SUBPOENA SERVED ON STEPHEN K. BANNON
Case Number: 1:2019mc00209
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Receipt on 02/14/2020 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 1:20-mc-00091 sent by Southern District of New York. (zrdj)
January 7, 2020 Filing fee received: for Pro Hac Vice Motion #7 $ 100.00, receipt number: 4616101986. (ztd)
January 6, 2020 Filing 14 Case transferred to the USDC for the USDC for the Southern District of New York, pursuant to the Court Order entered 01/05/2020. Sent to Court via Extraction. (ztd) (ztd).
January 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the USDC for the Southern District of New York: Strategic Vision's Motion to Transfer #2 is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to FORTHWITH transfer the case to the USDC for the Southern District of New York. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 01/05/2020. (lcdl)
January 3, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike #11 Reply to Document, #10 Response to motion by STEPHEN K. BANNON (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Burck, William)
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY in further support of Movant's Motion to Compel filed by STRATEGIC VISION US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Greim, Edward)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #2 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by STRATEGIC VISION US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Greim, Edward)
December 31, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum in opposition to re #2 MOTION to Transfer filed by STEPHEN K. BANNON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Burck, William).
December 31, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE #1 to Motion to Compel filed by STEPHEN K. BANNON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Burck, William) Modified to add linkage on 1/2/2020 (ztd).
December 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Allison L. McGuire, Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by STEPHEN K. BANNON (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Burck, William)
December 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William A. Burck on behalf of STEPHEN K. BANNON (Burck, William)
December 30, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 5 p.m. on 12/31/2019. Reply due by 5 p.m. 1/3/2020. (tb)
December 28, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Movant's #5 Motion for Expedited Briefing is hereby GRANTED. Respondent Stephen K. Bannon shall file and serve his response to the Motion to Transfer and Motion to Compel by 5PM on December 31, 2019. Movant Strategic Vision US LLC shall file and serve its replies by 5 PM on January 3, 2020. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/28/19. (lcdl)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Pending Motions by STRATEGIC VISION US LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Greim, Edward)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by STRATEGIC VISION US LLC. Case related to Case No. 18cv2185, USDC for the Southern District of New York. (ztth); Modified on 12/27/2019 (ztth).
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by STRATEGIC VISION US LLC. (ztth)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Transfer Case by STRATEGIC VISION US LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (ztth)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel (Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 4616101900.) filed by STRATEGIC VISION US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (ztth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re SUBPOENA SERVED ON STEPHEN K. BANNON et al v. BANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STRATEGIC VISION US LLC
Represented By: Edward D. Greim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STEPHEN K. BANNON
Represented By: William A. Burck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: SUBPOENA SERVED ON STEPHEN K. BANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?