UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: MISSOURI BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER, HACKENSACK MERIDIAN HEALTH, BLUE RIDGE HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., PIEDMONT NEWNAN HOSPITAL, INC., COLUMBUS REGIONAL HEALTHCARE SYSTEM INC., NORTHWEST MEDICAL CENTER, OCHSNER CLINIC FOUNDATION, STANFORD HEALTH CARE, PROGRESS WEST HEALTHCARE CENTER, RUSH UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, BARNES-JEWISH WEST COUNTY HOSPITAL, THE CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, FLORIDA HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER INC, EAST BATON ROUGE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, CENTRAL VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER, INC., SARASOTA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MONTEFIORE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., CARILION MEDICAL CENTER, VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, UNIVERSITY OF VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER, OSF HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, THE RECTOR AND VISITORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA, BARNES-JEWISH HOSPITAL, RECTOR AND VISITORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA, CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY doing business as CAROLINAS MEDICAL CENTER, CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY doing business as ATRIUM HEALTH UNION, OSF HEALTHCARE SYSTEM doing business as SAINT FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY doing business as ATRIUM HEALTH PINEVILLE, BLUE RIDGE HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC. doing business as CHS BLUE RIDGE, OCHSNER CLINIC FOUNDATION doing business as OCHSNER MEDICAL CENTER, OSF HEALTHCARE SYSTEM doing business as SAINT ANTHONY MEDICAL CENTER, HACKENSACK MERIDIAN HEALTH doing business as RIVERVIEW MEDICAL CENTER, OSF HEALTHCARE SYSTEM doing business as ST. JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER, HACKENSACK MERIDIAN HEALTH doing business as BAYSHORE MEDICAL CENTER, MONTEFIORE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as ST. LUKE'S CORNWALL HOSPITAL, EAST BATON ROUGE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as OCHSNER MEDICAL CENTER - BATON ROUGE, MONTEFIORE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as WHITE PLAINS HOSPITAL, RECTOR AND VISITORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA doing business as UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA MEDICAL CENTER, FLORIDA HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER INC doing business as TAMPA GENERAL HOSPITAL, MONTEFIORE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as MONTEFIORE MEDICAL CENTER, CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY doing business as CAROLINAS HEALTHCARE SYSTEM NORTHEAST, HACKENSACK MERIDIAN HEALTH doing business as JERSEY SHORE UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY doing business as ATRIUM HEALTH LINCOLN, OSF HEALTHCARE SYSTEM doing business as SAINT ANTHONY'S HEALTH CENTER, PROGRESS WEST HEALTHCARE CENTER doing business as PROGRESS WEST HOSPITAL and CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY doing business as ATRIUM HEALTH UNIVERSITY CITY
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2020cv00075
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: John D Bates
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley P. Humphreys on behalf of All Defendants (Humphreys, Bradley)
January 17, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/17/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/17/2020. (McElvain, Joel)
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/17/2020. (McElvain, Joel)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 1/17/2020 (McElvain, Joel)
January 15, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
January 15, 2020 Case assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zmc)
January 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by BARNES-JEWISH HOSPITAL, BARNES-JEWISH WEST COUNTY HOSPITAL, BLUE RIDGE HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., CARILION MEDICAL CENTER, CENTRAL VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER, INC., CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, COLUMBUS REGIONAL HEALTHCARE SYSTEM INC., EAST BATON ROUGE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, FLORIDA HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER INC, HACKENSACK MERIDIAN HEALTH, MISSOURI BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER, MONTEFIORE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., NORTHWEST MEDICAL CENTER, OCHSNER CLINIC FOUNDATION, OSF HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, PIEDMONT NEWNAN HOSPITAL, INC., PROGRESS WEST HEALTHCARE CENTER, RECTOR AND VISITORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA, RUSH UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, SARASOTA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, STANFORD HEALTH CARE, UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, UNIVERSITY OF VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER, VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER. Case related to Case No. 19-5352. (McElvain, Joel)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BARNES-JEWISH HOSPITAL, BARNES-JEWISH WEST COUNTY HOSPITAL, BLUE RIDGE HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., CARILION MEDICAL CENTER, CENTRAL VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER, INC., COLUMBUS REGIONAL HEALTHCARE SYSTEM INC., EAST BATON ROUGE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, FLORIDA HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER INC, HACKENSACK MERIDIAN HEALTH, MISSOURI BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER, MONTEFIORE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., NORTHWEST MEDICAL CENTER, OCHSNER CLINIC FOUNDATION, OSF HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, PIEDMONT NEWNAN HOSPITAL, INC., PROGRESS WEST HEALTHCARE CENTER, RUSH UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, SARASOTA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, STANFORD HEALTH CARE, THE CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, THE RECTOR AND VISITORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA, UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, UNIVERSITY OF VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER, VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER (McElvain, Joel)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6724524) filed by OSF HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, CENTRAL VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER, INC., NORTHWEST MEDICAL CENTER, HACKENSACK MERIDIAN HEALTH, BARNES-JEWISH HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, THE RECTOR AND VISITORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA, OCHSNER CLINIC FOUNDATION, UNIVERSITY OF VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER, RUSH UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, MONTEFIORE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., THE CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, FLORIDA HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER INC, STANFORD HEALTH CARE, CARILION MEDICAL CENTER, BARNES-JEWISH WEST COUNTY HOSPITAL, EAST BATON ROUGE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, SARASOTA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, COLUMBUS REGIONAL HEALTHCARE SYSTEM INC., PROGRESS WEST HEALTHCARE CENTER, BLUE RIDGE HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., PIEDMONT NEWNAN HOSPITAL, INC., MISSOURI BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(McElvain, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MISSOURI BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HACKENSACK MERIDIAN HEALTH
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLUE RIDGE HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PIEDMONT NEWNAN HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBUS REGIONAL HEALTHCARE SYSTEM INC.
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTHWEST MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OCHSNER CLINIC FOUNDATION
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STANFORD HEALTH CARE
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROGRESS WEST HEALTHCARE CENTER
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSH UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARNES-JEWISH WEST COUNTY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLORIDA HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER INC
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EAST BATON ROUGE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTRAL VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARASOTA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTEFIORE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARILION MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OSF HEALTHCARE SYSTEM
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE RECTOR AND VISITORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARNES-JEWISH HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RECTOR AND VISITORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY doing business as CAROLINAS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY doing business as ATRIUM HEALTH UNION
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OSF HEALTHCARE SYSTEM doing business as SAINT FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY doing business as ATRIUM HEALTH PINEVILLE
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLUE RIDGE HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC. doing business as CHS BLUE RIDGE
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OCHSNER CLINIC FOUNDATION doing business as OCHSNER MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OSF HEALTHCARE SYSTEM doing business as SAINT ANTHONY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HACKENSACK MERIDIAN HEALTH doing business as RIVERVIEW MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OSF HEALTHCARE SYSTEM doing business as ST. JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HACKENSACK MERIDIAN HEALTH doing business as BAYSHORE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTEFIORE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as ST. LUKE'S CORNWALL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EAST BATON ROUGE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as OCHSNER MEDICAL CENTER - BATON ROUGE
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTEFIORE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as WHITE PLAINS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RECTOR AND VISITORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA doing business as UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLORIDA HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER INC doing business as TAMPA GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTEFIORE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as MONTEFIORE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY doing business as CAROLINAS HEALTHCARE SYSTEM NORTHEAST
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HACKENSACK MERIDIAN HEALTH doing business as JERSEY SHORE UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY doing business as ATRIUM HEALTH LINCOLN
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OSF HEALTHCARE SYSTEM doing business as SAINT ANTHONY'S HEALTH CENTER
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROGRESS WEST HEALTHCARE CENTER doing business as PROGRESS WEST HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY doing business as ATRIUM HEALTH UNIVERSITY CITY
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Bradley P. Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?