SAINT-GOBAIN PERFORMANCE PLASTICS EUROPE v. BOLIVARIAN REPUBLIC OF VENEZUELA et al
Plaintiff: SAINT-GOBAIN PERFORMANCE PLASTICS EUROPE
Defendant: BOLIVARIAN REPUBLIC OF VENEZUELA and PETROLEOS DE VENEZUELA, S.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00129
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 27:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on March 6, 2020, at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/20/2020. (lcrc2)
January 16, 2020 Filing 41 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:18-cv-01963. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 15, 2020 Case electronically transferred to District of Columbia. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 40 Official Transcript of Oral Argument Hearing held on December 5, 2019 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Email: Brian_Gaffigan@ded.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or order/purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/3/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/12/2020.(bpg) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM ORDER regarding pending motions and stay. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/12/19. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01082-LPS et al. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 38 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Alexander A. Yanos, Counsel for Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe regarding Response to Letter Dated December 9, 2019 From Venezuela and PDVSA - re #36 Letter. (Jones, Laura) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORAL ORDER: Having received the letter dated December 9, 2019 (17-mc-151-LPS, D.I. 150), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that if Crystallex, or any other party or entity, wishes to respond, it shall file a letter no later than December 11, 2019. Ordered by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/10/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-mc-00151-LPS, 1:18-cv-01963-LPS, 1:19-mc-00290-LPS(etg) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 36 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from A. Thompson Bayliss, Esq., Samuel T. Hirzel, Esq. and Scott R. Haiber, Esq. regarding Frequently Asked Questions. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Letter)(Bayliss, A.) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Oral Argument held on 12/5/2019. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the hearing on December 5, 2019 will begin at 10:30 a.m. Each side will have forty-five (45) minutes for argument. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/2/19. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 34 Remark: Given recent developments in and affecting these matters - including OFAC's amendments to 31 C.F.R. Part 591 (see Dep't of Treasury, Off. of Foreign Assets Control, Venezuela Sanctions Regulations, 84 Fed. Reg. 64,415 (Nov. 22, 2019)); the Third Circuit's denial of the petitions for rehearing (see Order Sur Pet'n for Reh'g, Nos. 18-2797 & 18-3124 (3d Cir. Nov. 21, 2019)); the Southern District of New York's grant of motions to transfer venue to the District of Columbia to enforce arbitration awards (see Greentech Energy Sys. A/S v. Italian Republic, Case No. 19-cv-04398-LLS, D.I. 23 (S.D.N.Y. Nov. 8, 2019); CEF Energia, B.V. v. Italian Republic, Case No. 19-cv-09153-LLS, D.I. 13 (S.D.N.Y. Nov. 8, 2019)); and the related letters filed in 17-mc-00151-LPS (D.I. 146, 147), 18-cv-01963-LPS (D.I. 33), and 19-mc-00290-LPS (D.I. 20) - the Court requires additional time to determine how to proceed. The Court's current expectation is to provide the parties with an update by no later than on or about December 10, 2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01082-LPS et al. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 33 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from A. Thompson Bayliss regarding Supplemental Authority. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Letter)(Bayliss, A.) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
November 17, 2019 Filing 32 Official Transcript of In-Court Status Conference Hearing held on November 13, 2019 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Email: Brian_Gaffigan@ded.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or ordered/purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/18/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/17/2020. (bpg) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Status Conference held on 11/13/2019. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01082-LPS et al. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Status Conference today will begin at 4:00 PM. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/13/19. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01082-LPS et al. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hold a status conference on Wednesday, November 13, 2019, at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 6B in all of the following matters: 1:15-cv-01082-LPS; 1:16-cv-00904-LPS; 1:16-cv-01007-LPS; 1:17-cv-00028-LPS; 1:17-mc-00151-LPS; 1:18-mc-00343-LPS; 1:18-cv-01963-LPS; 1:19-cv-00290-LPS; 1:19-mc-00290-UNA. All parties, all proposed parties, and all potential intervenors are expected to attend. The Court's intent is NOT to hear argument on the pending motions in any of these cases but instead to discuss how and on what schedule the Court should proceed to resolve any and all disputes, if indeed it should proceed at all. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/6/19. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01082-LPS et al. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hear oral argument on all pending motions and issues on December 5, 2019 at 2:30 p.m. Each side will be allocated 45 minutes for its presentation. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/9/19. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 28 SUR-REPLY BRIEF re #25 MOTION for Leave to File /Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe's Motion to Authorize Filing of Surreply /Surreply to Venezuela's Reply in Support of Its Cross-Motion to Vacate the Clerk's Default and to Vacate or Transfer the Case filed by Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe. (Keane, Peter) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply (D.I. #25 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/30/2019. (etg) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re #25 MOTION for Leave to File /Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe's Motion to Authorize Filing of Surreply filed by Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela. (Bayliss, A.) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File /Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe's Motion to Authorize Filing of Surreply - filed by Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B - Surreply)(Keane, Peter) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 24 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela re #11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants. (Bayliss, A.) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY BRIEF re #11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants filed by Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela. (Bayliss, A.) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 22 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. re #11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants. (Haiber, Scott) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
August 21, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kent A. Yalowitz for Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)[Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
August 19, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney E. Whitney Debevoise, II for Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Sally Pei, Stephen K. Wirth, Avishai Don for Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #20 Stipulation filed by Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/15/19. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY BRIEF re #11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants filed by Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe. (Keane, Peter) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION Regarding Page Length of Plaintiff's Reply Brief re #16 Answering Brief in Opposition, #18 Answering Brief in Opposition by Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe. (Jones, Laura) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kent A. Yalowitz, E. Whitney Debevoise II, Sally L. Pei, Stephen K. Wirth, and Avishai D. Don filed by Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/9/19. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kent A. Yalowitz, E. Whitney Debevoise II, Sally L. Pei, Stephen K. Wirth, and Avishai D. Don - filed by Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela. (Bayliss, A.) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants filed by Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/14/2019. (Bayliss, A.) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Thompson Bayliss on behalf of Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela (Bayliss, A.) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants filed by Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/14/2019. (Haiber, Scott) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dennis H. Tracey, III filed by Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A., #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robin L. Muir filed by Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/5/19. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robin L. Muir - filed by Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A.. (Haiber, Scott) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dennis H. Tracey, III - filed by Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A.. (Haiber, Scott) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #13 STIPULATION to Extend the time for Defendants to oppose or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs motion for a default judgment. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/8/19. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION the time for Defendants to oppose or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs motion for a default judgment ( To Be So Ordered) re #11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants by Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A.. (Haiber, Scott) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott R. Haiber on behalf of Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. (Haiber, Scott) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants - filed by Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration)(Jones, Laura) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela, Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. - Re: #8 Request for Default filed by Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION re #8 REQUEST for Default as to Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela, Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. of Alexander A. Yanos by Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Keane, Peter) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST for Default as to Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela, Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. - filed by Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe. (Keane, Peter) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
December 26, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Alexander A. Yanos, Carlos Ramos-Mrosovsky, and Rajat Rana for Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Carlos Ramos-Mrosovsky filed by Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe, #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Rajat Rana filed by Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe, #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alexander A. Yanos filed by Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/20/18. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
December 19, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-mc-00343-LPS, 1:18-cv-01963-LPS (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Rajat Rana - filed by Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe. (Jones, Laura) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Carlos Ramos-Mrosovsky - filed by Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe. (Jones, Laura) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alexander A. Yanos - filed by Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe. (Jones, Laura) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
December 13, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela on 12/13/2018; Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. on 12/13/2018. (nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Compagnie de Saint-Gobain, Corporate Parent Societe de Participations Financieres et Industrielles for Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe filed by Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe. (Jones, Laura) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 DECLARATION re #1 Complaint, of Alexander A. Yanos In Support of Complaint to Register and Enforce ICSID Arbitration Award as a Foreign Judgment by Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Jones, Laura) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
December 13, 2018 No Summons Issued. (nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Register and Enforce ICSID Arbitration Award as a Foreign Judgment filed against Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela, Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2523429.) - filed by Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAINT-GOBAIN PERFORMANCE PLASTICS EUROPE v. BOLIVARIAN REPUBLIC OF VENEZUELA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOLIVARIAN REPUBLIC OF VENEZUELA
Represented By: Sally Pei
Represented By: Stephen K. Wirth
Represented By: Kent A. Yalowitz
Represented By: Eli Whitney Debevoise, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETROLEOS DE VENEZUELA, S.A.
Represented By: Scott R. Haiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT-GOBAIN PERFORMANCE PLASTICS EUROPE
Represented By: Carlos Ramos-Mrosovsky
Represented By: Alexander A. Yanos
Represented By: Rajat Rana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?