U.S. SILICA COMPANY v. CSX TRANSPORTATION INC. et al
Plaintiff: U.S. SILICA COMPANY
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION INC., UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO., BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY and NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2020cv00275
Filed: February 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Paul L Friedman
Referring Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY.(Stein, Linda)
March 10, 2020 Filing 14 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Stein, Linda)
March 10, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Bruder Fox on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Fox, Molly)
March 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Sue Stein on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Stein, Linda)
March 4, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Proposed Order by U.S. SILICA COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Stipulated Protective Order)(Ratner, Brian)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Case directly reassigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell pursuant to Order issued by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 2/20/2020. Judge Paul L. Friedman is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that this case shall be transferred to Chief Judge Howell's docket pursuant to Local Civil Rules 40.5(a) and 40.6(a). Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 20, 2020. (MA)
February 5, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Francis DiSalvo on behalf of U.S. SILICA COMPANY (DiSalvo, Theodore)
February 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth R. Gassman on behalf of U.S. SILICA COMPANY (Gassman, Seth)
February 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael David Hausfeld on behalf of U.S. SILICA COMPANY (Hausfeld, Michael)
February 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sathya S. Gosselin on behalf of U.S. SILICA COMPANY (Gosselin, Sathya)
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Melinda R Coolidge on behalf of U.S. SILICA COMPANY (Coolidge, Melinda)
February 4, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION INC., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
February 3, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Paul L. Friedman. (zmc)
February 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by U.S. SILICA COMPANY. Case related to Case No. 07-mc-489. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ratner, Brian)
February 1, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by U.S. SILICA COMPANY (Ratner, Brian)
February 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION INC., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6787735) filed by U.S. SILICA COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to BNSF Railway, #3 Summons as to CSX Transportation, #4 Summons as to Norfolk Southern, #5 Summons as to Union Pacific)(Ratner, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. SILICA COMPANY v. CSX TRANSPORTATION INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: Linda Sue Stein
Represented By: Molly Bruder Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. SILICA COMPANY
Represented By: Brian A. Ratner
Represented By: Theodore Francis DiSalvo
Represented By: Seth R. Gassman
Represented By: Sathya S. Gosselin
Represented By: Michael David Hausfeld
Represented By: Melinda R Coolidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?