BROOKS et al v. STEPHENS et al
Plaintiff: MAYA BROOKS, JANICE CURTIS and KEISHA WHITLOCK
Defendant: KARL STEPHENS and METROPOLITAN PROCESS SERVICES, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00339
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Richard J Leon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by MAYA BROOKS, JANICE CURTIS, KEISHA WHITLOCK. (O'Connor, John)
May 13, 2020 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT regarding resolution of case by MAYA BROOKS, JANICE CURTIS, KEISHA WHITLOCK. (O'Connor, John)
May 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig L. Holcomb on behalf of All Defendants (Holcomb, Craig)
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by KARL STEPHENS.(zjf) (Main Document 7 replaced on 4/7/2020) (zjf).
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of #6 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint on or before April 1, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 03/02/2020. (lcrjl3)
February 28, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re #1 Complaint, by KARL STEPHENS (jf)
February 14, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. METROPOLITAN PROCESS SERVICES, LLC served on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020 (O'Connor, John)
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KARL STEPHENS served on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020 (O'Connor, John)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/10/2020. (lcrjl3)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to METROPOLITAN PROCESS SERVICES, LLC, KARL STEPHENS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
February 7, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (adh, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against METROPOLITAN PROCESS SERVICES, LLC, KARL STEPHENS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6807903) filed by MAYA BROOKS, KEISHA WHITLOCK, JANICE CURTIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(O'Connor, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROOKS et al v. STEPHENS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAYA BROOKS
Represented By: John F. O'Connor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANICE CURTIS
Represented By: John F. O'Connor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEISHA WHITLOCK
Represented By: John F. O'Connor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KARL STEPHENS
Represented By: Craig L. Holcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN PROCESS SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Craig L. Holcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?