AMIR v. BARR
Petitioner: LOUIS DIOR AMIR
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR and WILLIAM P. BARR
Case Number: 1:2020cv00437
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Petitioner's Objection to Transfer Order. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file denied" Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 03/23/2020. (zjf)
March 19, 2020 Receipt on 03/19/2020 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 20-cv-00306 sent by USDC for the Northern District of New York. (zsb)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 Case transferred to the USDC for the Nothern District of New York, pursuant to the Court Order entered 2/23/2020. Sent to Court via by extraction. (jf)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Nothern District of New York (see document for details). Transfer due by 3/12/2020. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/21/20.(ah)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 4616102428.) filed by LOUIS DIOR AMIR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMIR v. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LOUIS DIOR AMIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?