UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. OLYMPUS GROWTH FUND VI, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: LIQUI-BOX, INC., DS SMITH PLC and OLYMPUS GROWTH FUND VI, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00464
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Extension of Time by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Hill, Christine)
March 4, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Miata Eggerly on behalf of LIQUI-BOX, INC., OLYMPUS GROWTH FUND VI, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Eggerly, Miata)
March 4, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Rocco on behalf of LIQUI-BOX, INC., OLYMPUS GROWTH FUND VI, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rocco, Katherine)
February 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF TUNNEY ACT REQUIREMENTS by DS SMITH PLC (Matelis, Joseph)
February 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF TUNNEY ACT REQUIREMENTS by LIQUI-BOX, INC., OLYMPUS GROWTH FUND VI, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Reilly, Matthew)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 02/25/2020. (lccrc3)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 02/25/2020. (lccrc3)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Asset Preservation Stipulation and Order. See full Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 02/25/2020. (lccrc3)
February 25, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of All Parties Regarding Divestiture Under the Proposed Final Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Hill, Christine)
February 24, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Notice due by 2/28/2020. (lsj)
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph James Matelis, II on behalf of DS SMITH PLC (Matelis, Joseph)
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Miata Eggerly, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6853160. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LIQUI-BOX, INC., OLYMPUS GROWTH FUND VI, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Reilly, Matthew)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court draws the parties' attention to Paragraphs A and J of the Divestitures section of the Proposed Final Judgment. Do the parties intend, upon entry of the Final Judgment, to require Defendants to divest and relocate the Divestiture Assets within 45 and 180 days, respectively, of entry of the Asset Preservation Stipulation and Order, which the parties are requesting to be entered forthwith? If so, how could those requirements be met given that entry of any Final Judgment would come only after compliance with the APPA procedures, which will necessarily take more than 45 days, and potentially more than 180 days? The parties are directed to file a joint notice clarifying the Court's confusion on or before Friday, February 28, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 02/21/2020. (lccrc3)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Katherine A. Rocco, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6852451. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LIQUI-BOX, INC., OLYMPUS GROWTH FUND VI, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Reilly, Matthew)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew James Reilly on behalf of LIQUI-BOX, INC., OLYMPUS GROWTH FUND VI, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Reilly, Matthew)
February 20, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmc)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 COMPETITIVE IMPACT STATEMENT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hill, Christine)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF TUNNEY ACT REQUIREMENTS by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Asset Preservation Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Hill, Christine)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Christine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. OLYMPUS GROWTH FUND VI, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIQUI-BOX, INC.
Represented By: Miata Eggerly
Represented By: Katherine Rocco
Represented By: Matthew James Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DS SMITH PLC
Represented By: Joseph James Matelis, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLYMPUS GROWTH FUND VI, L.P.
Represented By: Miata Eggerly
Represented By: Katherine Rocco
Represented By: Matthew James Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Christine A. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?