WESTROCK COMPANY et al v. BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: WESTROCK SOUTHEAST, LLC, WESTROCK VIRGINIA, LLC, WESTROCK COMPANY OF CANADA CORP./COMPAGNIE WESTROCK DU CANADA CORP., WESTROCK-REX, LLC, WESTROCK NORTHWEST, LLC, WESTROCK MILL COMPANY, LLC, WESTROCK COMPANY, WESTROCK CONTAINER, LLC, WESTROCK KRAFT PAPER, LLC, WESTROCK TEXAS, L.P., WESTROCK LONGVIEW, LLC, WESTROCK MINNESOTA CORPORATION, WESTROCK-SOLVAY, LLC, WESTROCK CP, LLC and WESTROCK COATED BOARD, LLC
Defendant: UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY and BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2020cv00482
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen R. Neuwirth on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Neuwirth, Stephen)
March 23, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Viola Trebicka on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Trebicka, Viola)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 18, 2020. (lcbah3)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING #32 Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 18, 2020. (lcbah3)
March 18, 2020 Filing 32 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by WESTROCK COATED BOARD, LLC, WESTROCK COMPANY, WESTROCK COMPANY OF CANADA CORP./COMPAGNIE WESTROCK DU CANADA CORP., WESTROCK CONTAINER, LLC, WESTROCK CP, LLC, WESTROCK KRAFT PAPER, LLC, WESTROCK LONGVIEW, LLC, WESTROCK MILL COMPANY, LLC, WESTROCK MINNESOTA CORPORATION, WESTROCK NORTHWEST, LLC, WESTROCK SOUTHEAST, LLC, WESTROCK TEXAS, L.P., WESTROCK VIRGINIA, LLC, WESTROCK-REX, LLC, WESTROCK-SOLVAY, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rashid, Sami)
March 17, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Sami H. Rashid on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rashid, Sami)
March 2, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin J. Mackowski on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Mackowski, Martin)
March 2, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Alan Gardiner on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Gardiner, Kent)
March 2, 2020 Filing 28 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (Reinhart, Tara)
March 2, 2020 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY.(Reinhart, Tara)
March 2, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara L. Reinhart on behalf of NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (Reinhart, Tara)
February 25, 2020 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY re #18 Answer to Complaint, #16 Notice of Appearance, #17 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests . (Maltas, Allyson)
February 25, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC..(van Houwelingen, Luke)
February 25, 2020 Filing 23 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (van Houwelingen, Luke)
February 25, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY.(Stein, Linda)
February 25, 2020 Filing 21 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Stein, Linda)
February 25, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Bruder Fox on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Fox, Molly)
February 25, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Sue Stein on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Stein, Linda)
February 25, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY.(Maltas, Allyson)
February 25, 2020 Filing 17 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (Maltas, Allyson)
February 25, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Allyson M. Maltas on behalf of UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (Maltas, Allyson)
February 20, 2020 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00754. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 19, 2020 Filing 14 TRANSFERRED to the USDC District of Columbia the electronic record. (sxb, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/20/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2925 Conditional Transfer Order filed 2/19/2020. (sxb, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/20/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 13 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to USDC District of Columbia. (sxb, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/20/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Potential Tag-Along Actions as to MDL No. 2925 (Exhibits) (sxb, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/20/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WestRock Kraft Paper, LLC, WestRock Southeast, LLC, WestRock Coated Board, LLC, WestRock Company, WestRock Longview, LLC, WestRock Company of Canada Corp./Compagnie WestRock du Canada Corp., WestRock Virginia, LLC, WestRock Mill Company, LLC, WestRock Container, LLC, WestRock-Rex, LLC, WestRock-Solvay, LLC, WestRock Northwest, LLC, WestRock Texas, L.P., WestRock Minnesota Corporation, WestRock CP, LLC as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020. (Schapiro, Andrew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/20/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WestRock Kraft Paper, LLC, WestRock Southeast, LLC, WestRock Coated Board, LLC, WestRock Company, WestRock Longview, LLC, WestRock Company of Canada Corp./Compagnie WestRock du Canada Corp., WestRock Virginia, LLC, WestRock Mill Company, LLC, WestRock Container, LLC, WestRock-Rex, LLC, WestRock-Solvay, LLC, WestRock Northwest, LLC, WestRock Texas, L.P., WestRock Minnesota Corporation, WestRock CP, LLC as to Union Pacific Railroad Company on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020. (Schapiro, Andrew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/20/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WestRock Kraft Paper, LLC, WestRock Southeast, LLC, WestRock Coated Board, LLC, WestRock Company, WestRock Longview, LLC, WestRock Company of Canada Corp./Compagnie WestRock du Canada Corp., WestRock Virginia, LLC, WestRock Mill Company, LLC, WestRock Container, LLC, WestRock-Rex, LLC, WestRock-Solvay, LLC, WestRock Northwest, LLC, WestRock Texas, L.P., WestRock Minnesota Corporation, WestRock CP, LLC as to CSX Transportation, Inc. on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020. (Schapiro, Andrew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/20/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WestRock Kraft Paper, LLC, WestRock Southeast, LLC, WestRock Coated Board, LLC, WestRock Company, WestRock Longview, LLC, WestRock Company of Canada Corp./Compagnie WestRock du Canada Corp., WestRock Virginia, LLC, WestRock Mill Company, LLC, WestRock Container, LLC, WestRock-Rex, LLC, WestRock-Solvay, LLC, WestRock Northwest, LLC, WestRock Texas, L.P., WestRock Minnesota Corporation, WestRock CP, LLC as to BNSF Railway Company on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020. (Schapiro, Andrew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/20/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 3/10/2020 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least three days prior to the initial status and all further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/20/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 3/10/2020 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least three days prior to the initial status and all further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/20/2020.]
February 3, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants BNSF Railway Company, CSX Transportation, Inc., Norfolk Southern Railway Company, and Union Pacific Railroad Company. (acm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/20/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/20/2020.]
February 3, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/20/2020.]
February 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs Corporate Disclosure Statement (Schapiro, Andrew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/20/2020.]
February 1, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs WestRock CP, LLC, WestRock Coated Board, LLC, WestRock Company, WestRock Company of Canada Corp./Compagnie WestRock du Canada Corp., WestRock Container, LLC, WestRock Kraft Paper, LLC, WestRock Longview, LLC, WestRock Mill Company, LLC, WestRock Minnesota Corporation, WestRock Northwest, LLC, WestRock Southeast, LLC, WestRock Texas, L.P., WestRock Virginia, LLC, WestRock-Rex, LLC, WestRock-Solvay, LLC by Andrew H. Schapiro (Schapiro, Andrew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/20/2020.]
February 1, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit Related Cases)(Schapiro, Andrew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/20/2020.]
February 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by WestRock Company of Canada Corp./Compagnie WestRock du Canada Corp., WestRock Kraft Paper, LLC, WestRock Virginia, LLC, WestRock Southeast, LLC, WestRock Mill Company, LLC, WestRock Container, LLC, WestRock Coated Board, LLC, WestRock-Solvay, LLC, WestRock-Rex, LLC, WestRock Northwest, LLC, WestRock Texas, L.P., WestRock Company, WestRock Minnesota Corporation, WestRock Longview, LLC, WestRock CP, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16680246.(Schapiro, Andrew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/20/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WESTROCK COMPANY et al v. BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY
Represented By: Allyson M. Maltas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Represented By: Luke P. van Houwelingen
Represented By: Martin J. Mackowski
Represented By: Kent Alan Gardiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: Tara L. Reinhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: Molly Bruder Fox
Represented By: Linda Sue Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESTROCK SOUTHEAST, LLC
Represented By: Sami H. Rashid
Represented By: Viola Trebicka
Represented By: Stephen R. Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESTROCK VIRGINIA, LLC
Represented By: Sami H. Rashid
Represented By: Viola Trebicka
Represented By: Stephen R. Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESTROCK COMPANY OF CANADA CORP./COMPAGNIE WESTROCK DU CANADA CORP.
Represented By: Sami H. Rashid
Represented By: Viola Trebicka
Represented By: Stephen R. Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESTROCK-REX, LLC
Represented By: Sami H. Rashid
Represented By: Viola Trebicka
Represented By: Stephen R. Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESTROCK NORTHWEST, LLC
Represented By: Sami H. Rashid
Represented By: Viola Trebicka
Represented By: Stephen R. Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESTROCK MILL COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Sami H. Rashid
Represented By: Viola Trebicka
Represented By: Stephen R. Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESTROCK COMPANY
Represented By: Sami H. Rashid
Represented By: Viola Trebicka
Represented By: Stephen R. Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESTROCK CONTAINER, LLC
Represented By: Sami H. Rashid
Represented By: Viola Trebicka
Represented By: Stephen R. Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESTROCK KRAFT PAPER, LLC
Represented By: Sami H. Rashid
Represented By: Viola Trebicka
Represented By: Stephen R. Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESTROCK TEXAS, L.P.
Represented By: Sami H. Rashid
Represented By: Viola Trebicka
Represented By: Stephen R. Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESTROCK LONGVIEW, LLC
Represented By: Sami H. Rashid
Represented By: Viola Trebicka
Represented By: Stephen R. Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESTROCK MINNESOTA CORPORATION
Represented By: Sami H. Rashid
Represented By: Viola Trebicka
Represented By: Stephen R. Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESTROCK-SOLVAY, LLC
Represented By: Sami H. Rashid
Represented By: Viola Trebicka
Represented By: Stephen R. Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESTROCK CP, LLC
Represented By: Sami H. Rashid
Represented By: Viola Trebicka
Represented By: Stephen R. Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESTROCK COATED BOARD, LLC
Represented By: Sami H. Rashid
Represented By: Viola Trebicka
Represented By: Stephen R. Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?