BRUNS et al v. USAA et al
Plaintiff: JENNY BRUNS and JEREMY BRUNS
Defendant: MARK A. DAVIS, ROBERT WILKIE, DALTON BRYANT, SR., ROBERT N. HUNTER, JR., ROY A. COOPER, III, CHERI BEASLEY, ERIC A. HOOKS, JOHN S. ARROWOOD, LINDA M. MCGEE, ROBIN E. HUDSON, KATHLEEN HAWK SAWYER, DONNA STROUD, USAA, RICHARD DIETZ, JAMES FLOYD AMMONS, JR., JESSIE K. LIU, ELAINE L. CHAO, VALERIE ZACHARY, FRANK L. PERRY, PAUL MARTIN NEWBY, SAMUEL J. ERVIN, IV, JOHN M. TYSON, PHILIP E. BERGER, JR., MICHAEL R. MORGAN, THOMAS M. WOODWARD, NICOLE R. NASON, DALTON BRYANT, JR., LUCY INMAN, RICHARD A. ELMORE, PHILIP H. CHEATWOOD, MIKE CAUSEY, ROBERT CHRISTOPHER DILLON, CLAIRE V. HILL, REUBEN F. YOUNG, LARRY D. HALL, JAMES C. OWENS, JOHN I. MALONE, JR., JEFFREY HUNTER MURPHY, JAMES H. TRODGON, III, RHONDA RENEE SUTTON BRYANT, MARK MARTIN, LEANN NEASE BROWN, WANDA G. BRYANT, ANN MARIE CALABRIA, WILLIAM P. BARR, JOSH STEIN and BARBARA JACKSON
Case Number: 1:2020cv00501
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 40 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, by JAMES FLOYD AMMONS, JR, JOHN S. ARROWOOD, CHERI BEASLEY, PHILIP E. BERGER, JR, WANDA G. BRYANT, ANN MARIE CALABRIA, MIKE CAUSEY, ROY A. COOPER, III, MARK A. DAVIS, RICHARD DIETZ, ROBERT CHRISTOPHER DILLON, RICHARD A. ELMORE, SAMUEL J. ERVIN, IV, LARRY D. HALL, CLAIRE V. HILL, ERIC A. HOOKS, ROBIN E. HUDSON, ROBERT N. HUNTER, JR, LUCY INMAN, BARBARA JACKSON, MARK MARTIN, LINDA M. MCGEE, MICHAEL R. MORGAN, JEFFREY HUNTER MURPHY, PAUL MARTIN NEWBY, FRANK L. PERRY, JOSH STEIN, DONNA STROUD, JAMES H. TRODGON, III, JOHN M. TYSON, THOMAS M. WOODWARD, REUBEN F. YOUNG, VALERIE ZACHARY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubin, Phillip)
April 17, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss by PHILIP H. CHEATWOOD (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Richardson, Amy)
April 13, 2020 Filing 38 Memorandum in opposition to re #34 Amended MOTION to Dismiss filed by JENNY BRUNS, JEREMY BRUNS. (jf)
April 13, 2020 Filing 37 REPLY to opposition to motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by DALTON BRYANT, SR, DALTON BRYANT, JR, RHONDA RENEE SUTTON BRYANT. (Boyce, Dawn)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #33 USAA's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer nunc pro tunc. As further explained in this Order, plaintiffs are hereby on notice that they have 14 days from today to respond to defendants' motions to dismiss, or those motions will be granted. For any additional dispositive motions filed by defendants, plaintiffs will have 14 days to respond, or those motions will be granted. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 04/08/2020. (lcrcl3)
April 8, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Dispositive Motions due by 4/22/2020. (lsj)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John I. Malone, Jr. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 04/07/2020. (lcrcl3)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #31 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David L. Brown. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 04/07/2020. (lcrcl3)
April 6, 2020 Filing 35 Memorandum in opposition to re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by JENNY BRUNS, JEREMY BRUNS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(zjf)
April 6, 2020 Filing 34 Amended MOTION to Dismiss by USAA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of USAA's Amended Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint with Exhibits 2015, #3 Exhibit B - Bruns Appellant Brief - 2016, #4 Exhibit C - NC COA Opinion, #5 Exhibit D - Petition to NC Supreme Court, #6 Exhibit E - NC Supreme Court Order, #7 Exhibit F - Petition to US Supreme Court, #8 Exhibit G - US Supreme Court Order Denying Writ of Certorari, #9 Exhibit H - Notice of Service of Process on USAA, #10 Exhibit I - Bruns Motion for Entry of Default Final Judgment, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Bernier, Thomas)
April 6, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, by USAA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bernier, Thomas)
April 6, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of USAA's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Final Default Judgment by USAA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bruns Motion for Entry of Default Final Judgment, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bernier, Thomas)
March 30, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #26 Notice of Appearance; emailed to tbernier@goldbergsegalla.com, cc'd 14 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please change address via Pacer (zjf, )
March 27, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David L. Brown, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6965716. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOHN I. MALONE, JR (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Brown in Support of Motion pro hac vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bernier, Thomas)
March 27, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John I. Malone, Jr., Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6965710. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by USAA (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Malone in Support of Motion pro hac vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bernier, Thomas)
March 27, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss by JOHN I. MALONE, JR (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant Malone's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bernier, Thomas)
March 27, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss by USAA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of USAA's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - NC State Court Complaint 2015, #3 Exhibit B - Appellant's Brief NC COA, #4 Exhibit C - NC COA Opinion, #5 Exhibit D - Bruns Petition to NC Supreme Court, #6 Exhibit E - NC Supreme Court Order, #7 Exhibit F - Bruns Petition to US Supreme Court, #8 Exhibit G - US Supreme Court Denial, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Bernier, Thomas)
March 27, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Peter Bernier on behalf of JOHN I. MALONE, JR (Bernier, Thomas)
March 27, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Peter Bernier on behalf of USAA (Bernier, Thomas)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants ERIC A. HOOKS and FRANK L. PERRY shall respond to the Complaint no later than 05/04/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 03/24/2020. (lcrcl3)
March 24, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, by ERIC A. HOOKS, FRANK L. PERRY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rodriguez, Orlando)
March 24, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Orlando Luis Rodriguez on behalf of ERIC A. HOOKS, FRANK L. PERRY (Rodriguez, Orlando)
March 23, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by WANDA G. BRYANT, DALTON BRYANT, SR., DALTON BRYANT, JR. by DALTON BRYANT, SR, DALTON BRYANT, JR, WANDA G. BRYANT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Boyce, Dawn)
March 23, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by DALTON BRYANT, SR, DALTON BRYANT, JR, WANDA G. BRYANT (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Boyce, Dawn)
March 23, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn E. Boyce on behalf of WANDA G. BRYANT (Boyce, Dawn)
March 23, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn E. Boyce on behalf of DALTON BRYANT, JR (Boyce, Dawn)
March 23, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn E. Boyce on behalf of DALTON BRYANT, SR (Boyce, Dawn)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Defendant Causey shall respond no later than 05/03/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 03/19/2020. (lcrcl3)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Defendant Boyette shall respond no later than 05/04/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 03/19/2020. (lcrcl3)
March 19, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint [DE 1] by MIKE CAUSEY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Daniel)
March 19, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Snipes Johnson on behalf of MIKE CAUSEY (Johnson, Daniel)
March 19, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint by JAMES H. TRODGON, III (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(Evans, Jonathan)
March 19, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan J Evans on behalf of JAMES H. TRODGON, III (Evans, Jonathan)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/17/2020. (lcrcl1)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until 04/28/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 03/17/2020. (lcrcl3)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until 04/28/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 03/17/2020. (lcrcl3)
March 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, by ROY A. COOPER, III, LARRY D. HALL, JOSH STEIN, THOMAS M. WOODWARD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rubin, Phillip)
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, by JAMES FLOYD AMMONS, JR, JOHN S. ARROWOOD, CHERI BEASLEY, PHILIP E. BERGER, JR, WANDA G. BRYANT, ANN MARIE CALABRIA, MARK A. DAVIS, RICHARD DIETZ, ROBERT CHRISTOPHER DILLON, RICHARD A. ELMORE, SAMUEL J. ERVIN, IV, CLAIRE V. HILL, ROBIN E. HUDSON, ROBERT N. HUNTER, JR, LUCY INMAN, BARBARA JACKSON, MARK MARTIN, LINDA M. MCGEE, MICHAEL R. MORGAN, JEFFREY HUNTER MURPHY, PAUL MARTIN NEWBY, DONNA STROUD, JOHN M. TYSON, REUBEN F. YOUNG, VALERIE ZACHARY (Shields, Kathryn)
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Hicks Shields on behalf of JAMES FLOYD AMMONS, JR, JOHN S. ARROWOOD, CHERI BEASLEY, PHILIP E. BERGER, JR, WANDA G. BRYANT, ANN MARIE CALABRIA, MARK A. DAVIS, RICHARD DIETZ, ROBERT CHRISTOPHER DILLON, RICHARD A. ELMORE, SAMUEL J. ERVIN, IV, CLAIRE V. HILL, ROBIN E. HUDSON, ROBERT N. HUNTER, JR, LUCY INMAN, BARBARA JACKSON, MARK MARTIN, LINDA M. MCGEE, MICHAEL R. MORGAN, JEFFREY HUNTER MURPHY, PAUL MARTIN NEWBY, DONNA STROUD, JOHN M. TYSON, REUBEN F. YOUNG, VALERIE ZACHARY (Shields, Kathryn)
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip Rubin on behalf of ROY A. COOPER, III, LARRY D. HALL, JOSH STEIN, THOMAS M. WOODWARD (Rubin, Phillip)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by PHILIP H. CHEATWOOD (Richardson, Amy)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Eckhardt Snyder on behalf of PHILIP H. CHEATWOOD (Snyder, Lauren)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy E Richardson on behalf of PHILIP H. CHEATWOOD (Richardson, Amy)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JAMES FLOYD AMMONS, JR, JOHN S. ARROWOOD, WILLIAM P. BARR, CHERI BEASLEY, PHILIP E. BERGER, JR, LEANN NEASE BROWN, DALTON BRYANT, SR, DALTON BRYANT, JR, WANDA G. BRYANT, ANN MARIE CALABRIA, MIKE CAUSEY, ELAINE L. CHAO, PHILIP H. CHEATWOOD, ROY A. COOPER, III, MARK A. DAVIS, RICHARD DIETZ, ROBERT CHRISTOPHER DILLON, RICHARD A. ELMORE, SAMUEL J. ERVIN, IV, LARRY D. HALL, CLAIRE V. HILL, ERIC A. HOOKS, ROBIN E. HUDSON, ROBERT N. HUNTER, JR, LUCY INMAN, BARBARA JACKSON, JESSIE K. LIU, JOHN I. MALONE, JR, MARK MARTIN, LINDA M. MCGEE, MICHAEL R. MORGAN, JEFFREY HUNTER MURPHY, NICOLE R. NASON, PAUL MARTIN NEWBY, JAMES C. OWENS, FRANK L. PERRY, KATHLEEN HAWK SAWYER, JOSH STEIN, DONNA STROUD, RHONDA RENEE SUTTON BRYANT, JAMES H. TRODGON, III, JOHN M. TYSON, USAA, ROBERT WILKIE, THOMAS M. WOODWARD, REUBEN F. YOUNG, VALERIE ZACHARY ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616102477) with Jury Demand filed by JEREMY BRUNS, JENNY BRUNS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zjf)
February 21, 2020 SUMMONS (51) Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRUNS et al v. USAA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK A. DAVIS
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT WILKIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DALTON BRYANT, SR.
Represented By: Dawn E. Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT N. HUNTER, JR.
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROY A. COOPER, III
Represented By: Phillip Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHERI BEASLEY
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC A. HOOKS
Represented By: Orlando Luis Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN S. ARROWOOD
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDA M. MCGEE
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBIN E. HUDSON
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHLEEN HAWK SAWYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONNA STROUD
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA
Represented By: Thomas Peter Bernier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD DIETZ
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES FLOYD AMMONS, JR.
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESSIE K. LIU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELAINE L. CHAO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALERIE ZACHARY
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK L. PERRY
Represented By: Orlando Luis Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL MARTIN NEWBY
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMUEL J. ERVIN, IV
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN M. TYSON
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIP E. BERGER, JR.
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL R. MORGAN
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS M. WOODWARD
Represented By: Phillip Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICOLE R. NASON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DALTON BRYANT, JR.
Represented By: Dawn E. Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUCY INMAN
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD A. ELMORE
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIP H. CHEATWOOD
Represented By: Amy E Richardson
Represented By: Lauren Eckhardt Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE CAUSEY
Represented By: Daniel Snipes Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT CHRISTOPHER DILLON
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAIRE V. HILL
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REUBEN F. YOUNG
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARRY D. HALL
Represented By: Phillip Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES C. OWENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN I. MALONE, JR.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Bernier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY HUNTER MURPHY
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES H. TRODGON, III
Represented By: Jonathan J Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHONDA RENEE SUTTON BRYANT
Represented By: Dawn E. Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK MARTIN
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEANN NEASE BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WANDA G. BRYANT
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Represented By: Dawn E. Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANN MARIE CALABRIA
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM P. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSH STEIN
Represented By: Phillip Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARBARA JACKSON
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNY BRUNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY BRUNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?