PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE DAWABSHEH FAMILY et al v. NETANYAHU et al
Plaintiff: PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE DAWABSHEH FAMILY, JOHN HEALY, HIBA BARGHOUTHI, BASSIM AL TAMIMI, RICH SIEGEL, LINDA KHATEEB, TY EBRIGHT, TAMARA JONES, HOMER LANGE, AHED AL TAMIMI, PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF AHMED DAWABSHEH, RAY GORDON and ALI HASSAN ALI
Defendant: BENJAMIN NETANYAHU, DONALD HIKIND, JARED KUSHNER, DANIEL GILBERT, MICHAEL HUCKABEE, SUSAN LEVIN-ABIR, RUDOLPH GIULIANI, MIRIAM ADELSON, AIPAC, DOV WEISSGLAS, HOWARD KOHR, DAVID FRIEDMAN, BRIAN SHANKMAN, WALID SHOEBAT, NEWT GINGRICH, ANDREW CUOMO, JASON GREENBLATT, GUSTAF CARDELIUS and DONALD J. TRUMP
Case Number: 1:2020cv00555
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS (19) Issued Electronically as to MIRIAM ADELSON, AIPAC, GUSTAF CARDELIUS, ANDREW CUOMO, DAVID FRIEDMAN, DANIEL GILBERT, NEWT GINGRICH, RUDOLPH GIULIANI, JASON GREENBLATT, DONALD HIKIND, MICHAEL HUCKABEE, HOWARD KOHR, JARED KUSHNER, SUSAN LEVIN-ABIR, BENJAMIN NETANYAHU, BRIAN SHANKMAN, WALID SHOEBAT, DONALD TRUMP, DOV WEISSGLAS. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(eg)
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by AHED AL TAMIMI.(McMahon, Martin)
March 13, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #5 Request for Summons to Issue was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (eg)
March 6, 2020 Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR.....REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by AHED AL TAMIMI.(McMahon, Martin) Modified on 3/13/2020 (eg).
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 28, 2020. (lcdlf3)
February 28, 2020 SUMMONS Not Issued as to MIRIAM ADELSON, AIPAC, GUSTAF CARDELIUS, ANDREW CUOMO, DAVID FRIEDMAN, DANIEL GILBERT, RUDOLPH GIULIANI, JASON GREENBLATT, DONALD HIKIND, MICHAEL HUCKABEE, HOWARD KOHR, JARED KUSHNER, SUSAN LEVIN-ABIR, BENJAMIN NETANYAHU, BRIAN SHANKMAN, WALID SHOEBAT, DONALD TRUMP, DOV WEISSGLAS (adh, )
February 28, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, )
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by AHED AL TAMIMI, BASSIM AL TAMIMI, ALI HASSAN ALI, HIBA BARGHOUTHI, TY EBRIGHT, RAY GORDON, JASON GREENBLATT, TAMARA JONES, LINDA KHATEEB, HOMER LANGE, PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF AHMED DAWABSHEH, PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE DAWABSHEH FAMILY, RICH SIEGEL. Case related to Case No. 17-DC-260. (adh, )
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF AHMED DAWABSHEH, PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE DAWABSHEH FAMILY, LINDA KHATEEB, TAMARA JONES, HIBA BARGHOUTHI, RAY GORDON, AHED AL TAMIMI, TY EBRIGHT, JOHN HEALY, RICH SIEGEL, ALI HASSAN ALI, HOMER LANGE, BASSIM AL TAMIMI filed by PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF AHMED DAWABSHEH, PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE DAWABSHEH FAMILY, LINDA KHATEEB, TAMARA JONES, HIBA BARGHOUTHI, RAY GORDON, AHED AL TAMIMI, TY EBRIGHT, JOHN HEALY, RICH SIEGEL, ALI HASSAN ALI, HOMER LANGE, BASSIM AL TAMIMI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McMahon, Martin)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE DAWABSHEH FAMILY, BENJAMIN NETANYAHU with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6862397), CIVIL COVER SHEET by PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE DAWABSHEH FAMILY filed by PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE DAWABSHEH FAMILY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(McMahon, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE DAWABSHEH FAMILY et al v. NETANYAHU et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENJAMIN NETANYAHU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD HIKIND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JARED KUSHNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL GILBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL HUCKABEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN LEVIN-ABIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUDOLPH GIULIANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIRIAM ADELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIPAC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOV WEISSGLAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWARD KOHR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID FRIEDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN SHANKMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALID SHOEBAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEWT GINGRICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW CUOMO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON GREENBLATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUSTAF CARDELIUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE DAWABSHEH FAMILY
Represented By: Martin F. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN HEALY
Represented By: Martin F. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HIBA BARGHOUTHI
Represented By: Martin F. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BASSIM AL TAMIMI
Represented By: Martin F. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICH SIEGEL
Represented By: Martin F. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA KHATEEB
Represented By: Martin F. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TY EBRIGHT
Represented By: Martin F. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMARA JONES
Represented By: Martin F. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOMER LANGE
Represented By: Martin F. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHED AL TAMIMI
Represented By: Martin F. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF AHMED DAWABSHEH
Represented By: Martin F. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAY GORDON
Represented By: Martin F. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALI HASSAN ALI
Represented By: Martin F. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?