DURU v. UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT et al
Plaintiff: ROSE ADANMA DURU
Defendant: ANGELA D. CAESAR, GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, CLERK'S OFFICE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, PATHWAYS TO HOUSING D, NATHALIA CIMBOLTI, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT, DEPUTY CLERK, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT, GEORGE WASHINGTON MEDICAL FACULTY ASSOCIATES, WILLIAM BARR, CLERK'S OFFICE SUPERVISOR, KAISER PERMANENTE MID-ATLANTIC REGION, MARK S. ZEMELMAN, AETNA HEALTHCARE, U.S.A. INC., KAISER PERMANENTE ADVANTAGE PLAN/MEMBERS, CITY OF FALLS CHURCH, PERMANENTE FEDERATION, LLC., HENRY J. KAISER, FAIRFAX COUNTY VIRGINIA GOVERNMENT, OFFICER, WILLIAM P. BARR, KAISER PERMANENTE GEORGIA, KAISER PERMANENTE HAWAII, SCOTT YOUNG, HAWAII PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, KAISER PERMANENTE MARYLAND, KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS AND HEALTH PLAN, UNNAMED BLACK FEMALE, AETNA HEALTHCARE OF TEXAS, AETNA HEALTHCARE OF PENNSYLVANIA, KARLA, KATHY LANCASTER, DANIEL MENGESHA, BERNARD J. TYSON, KAISER PERMANENTE U.S.A. INC., ARTHUR M. SOUTHAM, KAISER PERMANENTE NORTHWEST REGION, RAYMOND J. BAXTER, ANTHONY A. BARUETA, MARTHA WILBUR, SOUTHEAST PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, KAISER FAMILY FOUNDATION, RADIOLOGY TECHNICIAN, KEVIN DAVEY, ROBERT SCHREINER, KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN OF COLORADO, COBBS WORKS/WORKFORCE, PALLIATIVE CARE TEAM, BENJAMIN K. CHU, KAISER PERMANENTE COLORADO, DONNA LYNNE, CHRIS GRANT, KERRY KOHNEN, PERMANENTE VENTURE INVESTMENTS, RICHARD D. DANIELS, NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL OF ATLANTA, GA, KAISER PERMANENTE PHARMACIES, NEW HOPE HOUSING AT BAILEYS CROSSROADS COMMUNITY SHELTER, SAINT JOSEPH'S HOSPITAL OF ATLANTA, AETNA HEALTHCARE OF CALIFORNIA, CHRISTOPHER IVERSON, EMERGENCY ROOM REGISTRATION STAFF, KAISER PERMANENTE VIRGINIA, KAISER PERMANENTE SECONDARY HEALTH PLAN, AETNA HEALTHCARE OF KENTUCKY, KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN OF GEORGIA, CHUCK COLUMBUS, GREGORY A. ADAMS, PATRICK T. COURNEYA, GEOFFREY S. SEWELL, SANDRA WOLINER, COBB COUNTY, GEORGIA, KAISER PERMANENTE SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, PATHWAYS TO HOUSING DC, KIM KAISER, CATHOLIC HEALTH, COMCAST/XFINITY, EDIGAR, KAISER PERMANENTE CAPITOL HILL and KAISER PERMANENTE NORTHERN CALIFORNIA
Case Number: 1:2020cv00649
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 USCA Case Number 20-5109 for #11 Notice of Appeal filed by ROSE ADANMA DURU. (zrdj)
April 24, 2020 Filing 22 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. AETNA HEALTHCARE OF CALIFORNIA served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; AETNA HEALTHCARE OF KENTUCKY served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; AETNA HEALTHCARE OF PENNSYLVANIA served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; AETNA HEALTHCARE OF TEXAS served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; AETNA HEALTHCARE, U.S.A. INC. served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020 (eg)
April 21, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Default Judgment as to by ROSE ADANMA DURU (eg)
April 21, 2020 Filing 21 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KEVIN DAVEY served on 3/10/2020, answer due 3/31/2020; GEORGE WASHINGTON MEDICAL FACULTY ASSOCIATES served on 3/10/2020, answer due 3/31/2020; GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL served on 3/10/2020, answer due 3/31/2020 (eg)
April 21, 2020 Filing 20 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CITY OF FALLS CHURCH served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; FAIRFAX COUNTY VIRGINIA GOVERNMENT served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; KARLA served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; DANIEL MENGESHA served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; NEW HOPE HOUSING AT BAILEYS CROSSROADS COMMUNITY SHELTER served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; UNNAMED BLACK FEMALE served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020 (eg)
April 21, 2020 Filing 19 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SAINT JOSEPH'S HOSPITAL OF ATLANTA served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; SAINT JOSEPH'S HOSPITAL OF ATLANTA(Administration) served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020 (eg)
April 21, 2020 Filing 18 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. COBB COUNTY, GEORGIA served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; COBBS WORKS/WORKFORCE served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020 (eg)
April 21, 2020 Filing 17 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL OF ATLANTA, GA(COO - Chief Operating Officer) served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL OF ATLANTA, GA(CFO - Chief Financial Officer) served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL OF ATLANTA, GA(CEO/President) served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL OF ATLANTA, GA(Administration) served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL OF ATLANTA, GA served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL OF ATLANTA, GA(Executive Medical Director) served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; SANDRA WOLINER served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020 (eg)
April 21, 2020 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. COMCAST/XFINITY(Corporate) served on 3/10/2020, answer due 3/31/2020; COMCAST/XFINITY(Marietta, Georgia) served on 3/10/2020, answer due 3/31/2020 (eg)
April 21, 2020 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. (eg)
April 21, 2020 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GREGORY A. ADAMS served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; ANTHONY A. BARUETA served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; RAYMOND J. BAXTER served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; BENJAMIN K. CHU served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; CHUCK COLUMBUS served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; PATRICK T. COURNEYA served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; RICHARD D. DANIELS served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; CHRIS GRANT served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; HAWAII PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN OF GEORGIA served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS AND HEALTH PLAN served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; KAISER PERMANENTE ADVANTAGE PLAN/MEMBERS served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; KAISER PERMANENTE CAPITOL HILL served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; KAISER PERMANENTE COLORADO served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; KAISER PERMANENTE GEORGIA served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; KAISER PERMANENTE HAWAII served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; KAISER PERMANENTE MARYLAND served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; KAISER PERMANENTE MID-ATLANTIC REGION served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; KAISER PERMANENTE NORTHERN CALIFORNIA served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; KAISER PERMANENTE NORTHWEST REGION served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; KAISER PERMANENTE PHARMACIES served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; KAISER PERMANENTE SECONDARY HEALTH PLAN served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; KAISER PERMANENTE VIRGINIA served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; KATHY LANCASTER served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; DONNA LYNNE served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; PALLIATIVE CARE TEAM served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; PERMANENTE FEDERATION, LLC. served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; PERMANENTE VENTURE INVESTMENTS served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; GEOFFREY S. SEWELL served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; ARTHUR M. SOUTHAM served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; SOUTHEAST PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; BERNARD J. TYSON served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; SCOTT YOUNG served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; MARK S. ZEMELMAN served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020 (eg).
April 21, 2020 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHRISTOPHER IVERSON served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; HENRY J. KAISER served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; KIM KAISER served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; KAISER FAMILY FOUNDATION(COO - Chief Operating Officer) served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; KAISER FAMILY FOUNDATION(CEO/President) served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; KAISER FAMILY FOUNDATION served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; KAISER FAMILY FOUNDATION(CFO - Chief Financial Officer) served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; KAISER PERMANENTE U.S.A. INC. served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; KERRY KOHNEN served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; ROBERT SCHREINER(and Family) served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; MARTHA WILBUR served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020 (eg)
April 20, 2020 Filing 12 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court re #11 Notice of Appeal. (eg)
April 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #7 Order, #8 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Order on Motion to Quash by ROSE ADANMA DURU. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (eg)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying as moot George Washington University Hospital's #9 Motion to Dismiss and #10 Motion to Quash. The court has already dismissed this action for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. See ECF No. 8. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/8/2020. (lcapm1)
April 8, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Quash Service of Process by GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Monahan, Thomas)
April 8, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Monahan, Thomas)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. For the reasons stated in the court's Memorandum Opinion, ECF No. 7, Plaintiff's Complaint, ECF No. 1, is dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. The pending motions filed by Defendants Fairfax County, ECF Nos. 25, and St. Joseph's Hospital of Atlanta, ECF No. 6, are denied as moot. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/6/2020. (lcapm1)
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Please see the attached Memorandum Opinion for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/6/2020. (lcapm1)
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to Obtain Leave of Court by SAINT JOSEPH'S HOSPITAL OF ATLANTA, SAINT JOSEPH'S HOSPITAL OF ATLANTA(Administration) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mims, Buffy)
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Quash by FAIRFAX COUNTY VIRGINIA GOVERNMENT (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(McGavin, John)
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by FAIRFAX COUNTY VIRGINIA GOVERNMENT (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McGavin, John)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Quash by FAIRFAX COUNTY VIRGINIA GOVERNMENT (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(McGavin, John)
March 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss by FAIRFAX COUNTY VIRGINIA GOVERNMENT (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McGavin, John)
March 5, 2020 SUMMONS (95) Issued as to GREGORY A. ADAMS, AETNA HEALTHCARE OF CALIFORNIA, AETNA HEALTHCARE OF KENTUCKY , AETNA HEALTHCARE OF PENNSYLVANIA , AETNA HEALTHCARE OF TEXAS, AETNA HEALTHCARE, U.S.A. INC., WILLIAM P. BARR, ANTHONY A. BARUETA, RAYMOND J. BAXTER, ANGELA D. CAESAR, CATHOLIC HEALTH , BENJAMIN K. CHU, NATHALIA CIMBOLTI, CITY OF FALLS CHURCH, CLERK'S OFFICE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, COBB COUNTY, GEORGIA, COBBS WORKS/WORKFORCE, CHUCK COLUMBUS, COMCAST/XFINITY(Corporate), COMCAST/XFINITY(Marietta, Georgia), PATRICK T. COURNEYA, RICHARD D. DANIELS, KEVIN DAVEY, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT, EDIGAR, FAIRFAX COUNTY VIRGINIA GOVERNMENT, GEORGE WASHINGTON MEDICAL FACULTY ASSOCIATES, GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, CHRIS GRANT, HAWAII PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, CHRISTOPHER IVERSON, HENRY J. KAISER (2), KIM KAISER (2), KAISER FAMILY FOUNDATION(COO - Chief Operating Officer), KAISER FAMILY FOUNDATION(CEO/President), KAISER FAMILY FOUNDATION (2), KAISER FAMILY FOUNDATION(CFO - Chief Financial Officer), KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN OF COLORADO, KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN OF GEORGIA, KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS AND HEALTH PLAN, KAISER PERMANENTE ADVANTAGE PLAN/MEMBERS, KAISER PERMANENTE CAPITOL HILL, KAISER PERMANENTE COLORADO, KAISER PERMANENTE GEORGIA, KAISER PERMANENTE HAWAII, KAISER PERMANENTE MARYLAND, KAISER PERMANENTE MID-ATLANTIC REGION, KAISER PERMANENTE NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, KAISER PERMANENTE NORTHWEST REGION, KAISER PERMANENTE PHARMACIES, KAISER PERMANENTE SECONDARY HEALTH PLAN, KAISER PERMANENTE SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, KAISER PERMANENTE U.S.A. INC. (2), KAISER PERMANENTE VIRGINIA, KARLA, KERRY KOHNEN, KATHY LANCASTER, DONNA LYNNE, DANIEL MENGESHA, NEW HOPE HOUSING AT BAILEYS CROSSROADS COMMUNITY SHELTER, NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL OF ATLANTA, GA(COO - Chief Operating Officer), NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL OF ATLANTA, GA(CFO - Chief Financial Officer), NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL OF ATLANTA, GA(CEO/President), NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL OF ATLANTA, GA(Administration), NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL OF ATLANTA, GA, NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL OF ATLANTA, GA(Executive Medical Director), PATHWAYS TO HOUSING DC, PERMANENTE FEDERATION, LLC., PERMANENTE VENTURE INVESTMENTS, SAINT JOSEPH'S HOSPITAL OF ATLANTA, SAINT JOSEPH'S HOSPITAL OF ATLANTA(Administration), ROBERT SCHREINER(and Family) (2), ROBERT SCHREINER(Mrs. (Spouse)) (2), ROBERT SCHREINER(Mrs. (Mother)) (2), ROBERT SCHREINER("ROB" - Long term Medical Executive Committee Member ) (4), GEOFFREY S. SEWELL, ARTHUR M. SOUTHAM, SOUTHEAST PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, BERNARD J. TYSON, UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT, MARTHA WILBUR, SANDRA WOLINER, SCOTT YOUNG, MARK S. ZEMELMAN , U.S. Attorney. (eg) Modified on 4/3/2020 (znmw).
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616102593) with Jury Demand filed by ROSE ADANMA DURU. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DURU v. UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGELA D. CAESAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Monahan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLERK'S OFFICE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATHWAYS TO HOUSING D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATHALIA CIMBOLTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUTY CLERK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE WASHINGTON MEDICAL FACULTY ASSOCIATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLERK'S OFFICE SUPERVISOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER PERMANENTE MID-ATLANTIC REGION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK S. ZEMELMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETNA HEALTHCARE, U.S.A. INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER PERMANENTE ADVANTAGE PLAN/MEMBERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF FALLS CHURCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERMANENTE FEDERATION, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENRY J. KAISER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAIRFAX COUNTY VIRGINIA GOVERNMENT
Represented By: John David McGavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM P. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER PERMANENTE GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER PERMANENTE HAWAII
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAWAII PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER PERMANENTE MARYLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS AND HEALTH PLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNNAMED BLACK FEMALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETNA HEALTHCARE OF TEXAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETNA HEALTHCARE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KARLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHY LANCASTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL MENGESHA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERNARD J. TYSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER PERMANENTE U.S.A. INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARTHUR M. SOUTHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER PERMANENTE NORTHWEST REGION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAYMOND J. BAXTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY A. BARUETA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTHA WILBUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHEAST PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER FAMILY FOUNDATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RADIOLOGY TECHNICIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN DAVEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT SCHREINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN OF COLORADO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COBBS WORKS/WORKFORCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PALLIATIVE CARE TEAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENJAMIN K. CHU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER PERMANENTE COLORADO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONNA LYNNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIS GRANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KERRY KOHNEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERMANENTE VENTURE INVESTMENTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD D. DANIELS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL OF ATLANTA, GA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER PERMANENTE PHARMACIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW HOPE HOUSING AT BAILEYS CROSSROADS COMMUNITY SHELTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAINT JOSEPH'S HOSPITAL OF ATLANTA
Represented By: Buffy J. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETNA HEALTHCARE OF CALIFORNIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER IVERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMERGENCY ROOM REGISTRATION STAFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER PERMANENTE VIRGINIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER PERMANENTE SECONDARY HEALTH PLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETNA HEALTHCARE OF KENTUCKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN OF GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHUCK COLUMBUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY A. ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK T. COURNEYA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEOFFREY S. SEWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDRA WOLINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COBB COUNTY, GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER PERMANENTE SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATHWAYS TO HOUSING DC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIM KAISER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATHOLIC HEALTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMCAST/XFINITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDIGAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER PERMANENTE CAPITOL HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER PERMANENTE NORTHERN CALIFORNIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSE ADANMA DURU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?