THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ALABAMA et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: THE HEALTH CARE AUTHORITY FOR BAPTIST HEALTH, AN AFFILIATE OF UAB HEALTH SYSTEM, THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ALABAMA, HEALTH CARE AUTHORITY FOR BAPTIST HEALTH, AN AFFILIATE OF UAB HEALTH SYSTEM, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ALABAMA, HEALTH CARE AUTHORITY FOR BAPTIST HEALTH, AN AFFILIATE OF UAB HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER SOUTH and BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ALABAMA doing business as UAB HOSPITAL
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2020cv00674
Filed: March 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ALABAMA, HEALTH CARE AUTHORITY FOR BAPTIST HEALTH, AN AFFILIATE OF UAB HEALTH SYSTEM. Attorney Elizabeth N. Swayne terminated. (Swayne, Elizabeth)
April 7, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Stay by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandberg, Justin)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Defendant's unopposed motion to stay proceedings: It is hereby ORDERED that the proceedings in this case are STAYED until further order from the Court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report within 90 days of issuance of a decision in American Hospital Association v. Azar, Nos. 19-5048, 19-5198 (D.C. Cir.). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 7, 2020. (lcrc3)
March 30, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/13/2020. (Kenny, Christopher)
March 30, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/13/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/12/2020. (Kenny, Christopher)
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 3/13/2020 (Kenny, Christopher)
March 9, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
March 9, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (adh, )
March 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Polston on behalf of THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ALABAMA, THE HEALTH CARE AUTHORITY FOR BAPTIST HEALTH, AN AFFILIATE OF UAB HEALTH SYSTEM (Polston, Mark)
March 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth N. Swayne on behalf of THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ALABAMA, THE HEALTH CARE AUTHORITY FOR BAPTIST HEALTH, AN AFFILIATE OF UAB HEALTH SYSTEM (Swayne, Elizabeth)
March 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ALABAMA, THE HEALTH CARE AUTHORITY FOR BAPTIST HEALTH, AN AFFILIATE OF UAB HEALTH SYSTEM. Case related to Case No. 19-03751. (Kenny, Christopher)
March 6, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ALABAMA, THE HEALTH CARE AUTHORITY FOR BAPTIST HEALTH, AN AFFILIATE OF UAB HEALTH SYSTEM (Kenny, Christopher)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6897716) filed by THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ALABAMA, THE HEALTH CARE AUTHORITY FOR BAPTIST HEALTH, AN AFFILIATE OF UAB HEALTH SYSTEM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Kenny, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ALABAMA et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Justin Michael Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE HEALTH CARE AUTHORITY FOR BAPTIST HEALTH, AN AFFILIATE OF UAB HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Represented By: Christopher P. Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ALABAMA
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Represented By: Christopher P. Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEALTH CARE AUTHORITY FOR BAPTIST HEALTH, AN AFFILIATE OF UAB HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Represented By: Christopher P. Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ALABAMA
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Represented By: Christopher P. Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEALTH CARE AUTHORITY FOR BAPTIST HEALTH, AN AFFILIATE OF UAB HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER SOUTH
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Represented By: Christopher P. Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ALABAMA doing business as UAB HOSPITAL
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Represented By: Christopher P. Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?