CARPIEN v. RBC CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC
Plaintiff: Jannet Carpien
Defendant: RBC CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00687
Filed: March 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1362
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Cases Consolidated. Case 20-0687 has been consolidated with 19-483 pursuant to Minute Orders entered 04/30/2020. ALL PLEADINGS MUST BE FILED IN LEAD CASE NO. 19-483. THE PARTIES ARE ADVISED NOT TO ELECT TO SPREAD TEXT WHEN FILING IN ECF. (eg)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. After review of Defendant's #3 Consent Motion to Consolidate, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that this action is consolidated with the related action Carpien v. RBC Capital Markets, LLC, No. 19-cv-483, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a). All future filings in these consolidated cases shall be made only in the first-filed case, No. 19-cv-483. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case, No. 20-cv-687, after consolidation. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 30, 2020. (lccjn1)
April 21, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by RBC CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC.(Flood, John)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. After review of Defendant's #7 Consent Motion for One Day Extension to Answer Complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and that Defendant shall file its Answer to the Complaint on April 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 21, 2020. (lccjn1)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by RBC CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flood, John)
April 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaclyn L. West Hamlin on behalf of RBC CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC (Hamlin, Jaclyn)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 8, 2020. (lccjn1)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 Case reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols as there is a related case. Judge Royce C. Lamberth is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases by RBC CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flood, John)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to RBC CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
March 10, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (adh, )
March 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RBC CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6901960) filed by RBC CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Wallace, Krista)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARPIEN v. RBC CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC
Represented By: John B. Flood
Represented By: Jaclyn L. West Hamlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jannet Carpien
Represented By: Krista Kate Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?