DE LA CRUZ VELASQUEZ v. NEW JAPAN, INC. et al
Plaintiff: MANUEL DE LA CRUZ VELASQUEZ and ERASMO AMAYA
Defendant: NEW JAPAN, INC., NOBUHIRO YAMAZAKI, JIN YAMAZAKI and NEW JAPAN, INC. doing business as SUSHI TARO
Case Number: 1:2020cv00705
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responsive Pleading due by 6/1/2020. (zjd)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Defendants' Second Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall file their responsive pleadings on or before June 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/28/2020. (lcapm3)
April 28, 2020 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by NEW JAPAN, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Greener, Joseph)
March 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Elizabeth Henninger on behalf of NEW JAPAN, INC. (Henninger, Sarah) (Main Document 8 replaced on 3/31/2020) (zeg).
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua B. Waxman on behalf of NEW JAPAN, INC. (Waxman, Joshua) (Main Document 7 replaced on 3/31/2020) (zeg).
March 31, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Complaint due by 5/1/2020. (zjd)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants' responsive pleadings shall be due on or before May 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/31/2020. (lcapm3)
March 30, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by NEW JAPAN, INC., JIN YAMAZAKI, NOBUHIRO YAMAZAKI (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Greener, Joseph)
March 24, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NEW JAPAN, INC. served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020 (Zelikovitz, Justin)
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JIN YAMAZAKI served on 3/18/2020, answer due 4/8/2020 (Zelikovitz, Justin)
March 20, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NOBUHIRO YAMAZAKI served on 3/18/2020, answer due 4/8/2020 (Zelikovitz, Justin)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NEW JAPAN, INC., JIN YAMAZAKI, NOBUHIRO YAMAZAKI. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
March 12, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmc)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6911601) filed by MANUEL DE LA CRUZ VELASQUEZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons (3))(Zelikovitz, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DE LA CRUZ VELASQUEZ v. NEW JAPAN, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANUEL DE LA CRUZ VELASQUEZ
Represented By: Justin Derek Zelikovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERASMO AMAYA
Represented By: Justin Derek Zelikovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JAPAN, INC.
Represented By: Joseph B. Greener
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Henninger
Represented By: Joshua B. Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOBUHIRO YAMAZAKI
Represented By: Joseph B. Greener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIN YAMAZAKI
Represented By: Joseph B. Greener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JAPAN, INC. doing business as SUSHI TARO
Represented By: Joseph B. Greener
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Henninger
Represented By: Joshua B. Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?