SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL-GNADEN HUETTEN CAMPUS et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: SAINT LUKES HOSPITAL-GNADEN HUETTEN, SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL-PALMERTON CAMPUS and SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL-GNADEN HUETTEN CAMPUS
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR and ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2020cv00771
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALEX M. AZAR, II. Case related to Case No. 19-mc-00190. (Bryce, Peter)
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Bryce on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Bryce, Peter)
May 4, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/3/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/2/2020. (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 4, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 3/23/2020 (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/3/2020. (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 1, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document Nos. re #6 Certificate of Service, #7 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using the "SERVICE OF PROCESS" event. (zjf)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 ENTERED IN ERROR.....CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL-GNADEN HUETTEN CAMPUS re #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Certificate of Service . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Marcus, Kenneth) Modified on 5/1/2020 (zjf).
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 ENTERED IN ERROR.....CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL-GNADEN HUETTEN CAMPUS re #5 Certificate of Service . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Marcus, Kenneth) Modified on 5/1/2020 (zjf).
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR.....CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL-GNADEN HUETTEN CAMPUS . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Marcus, Kenneth) Modified on 5/1/2020 (zjf).
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
March 19, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL-PALMERTON CAMPUS, SAINT LUKES HOSPITAL-GNADEN HUETTEN. Case related to Case No. 18-0222. (Marcus, Kenneth)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL-PALMERTON CAMPUS, SAINT LUKES HOSPITAL-GNADEN HUETTEN (Marcus, Kenneth)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against ALEX M. AZAR SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6933904) filed by SAINT LUKES HOSPITAL-GNADEN HUETTEN, SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL-PALMERTON CAMPUS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, #5 Summons ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES, #6 Summons UNITED STATES ATTORNEY)(Marcus, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL-GNADEN HUETTEN CAMPUS et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT LUKES HOSPITAL-GNADEN HUETTEN
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL-PALMERTON CAMPUS
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL-GNADEN HUETTEN CAMPUS
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Peter M. Bryce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?